This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:42:50 (UTC).

SHAUL SHMAYA vs. JULIE ANN BACON

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 SHAUL SHMAYA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JULIE ANN BACON. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Duesdieker, George. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0730

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Duesdieker, George

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHMAYA, SHAUL

Defendant

BACON, JULIE ANN

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim.

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Returned Unserved by Certified Mail.

Returned Unserved by Certified Mail Hearing Date: 8/3/18 Comment Hearing Date: 8/3/18

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF WITHOUT PREJUDICE.); Party; Names: SHMAYA SHAUL; BACON, JULIE ANN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Duesdieker George Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Unserved by Certified Mail. Additional Info: Returned Unserved by Certified Mail Hearing Date: 8/3/18 Comment Hearing Date: 8/3/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for SHMAYA, SHAUL : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037413-HOJ SHMAYA, SHAUL $67.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for SHMAYA, SHAUL : Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for SHMAYA, SHAUL : Transaction Assessment $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for SHMAYA, SHAUL : Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: SHMAYA, SHAUL; Total Financial Assessment $67.50; Total Payments and Credits $67.50

    Read MoreRead Less