This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:58:49 (UTC).

SHARITA BOLDS ET AL V AUTO STAR

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 SHARITA BOLDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTO STAR. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McKenna, Kathleen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6871

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

McKenna, Kathleen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHARITA BOLDS

E Palo Alto, CA 94303

BOLDS, SHARITA

RICHARDSON, LAWRENCE

Defendants

AUTO STAR

103 El Camino Real

Belmont, CA 94002

AUTO STAR C/O DAVID MOKHATARI

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSBC: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF BOLDS SERVED AS TO AUTO STAR ON 08/08/12 BY REGISTERED SERVER. PARTY SERVED: DAVID MOKHATARI COSTS: $65.00 HEARING DATE: 09/10/12

Plaintiff's Claim.

CLAIM Comment PCF2: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

Petition.

PETITION Comment PETMI: PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY SHARITA BOLDS LAWRENCE RICHARDSON.

Order.

ORDER Comment O: ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM SIGNED BY COMM. MCKENNA ON 08/23/12, FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: AUTO STAR C/O DAVID MOKHATARI; Comment: 0001 PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM; Party; Name: RICHARDSON LAWRENCE; Comment: 0001 PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM; Party; Name: BOLDS, SHARITA; Comment: 0001 PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY MGRIFFIN ON 09/17/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CDWOPE: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PTYNP: AUTO STAR NOT PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PTYNP: LAWRENCE RICHARDSON NOT PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PTYNP: SHARITA BOLDS NOT PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer McKenna Kathleen Comment COMCLK: COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. MCKENNA PRESIDING. CLERK: MARIE GRIFFIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer McKenna Kathleen Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition. Additional Info: PETITION Comment PETMI: PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY SHARITA BOLDS LAWRENCE RICHARDSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSBC: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF BOLDS SERVED AS TO AUTO STAR ON 08/08/12 BY REGISTERED SERVER. PARTY SERVED: DAVID MOKHATARI COSTS: $65.00 HEARING DATE: 09/10/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ACRC: AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $3625.00. REASON FOR CLAIM: FOR CAR REPAIR, REFUND ON A CAR, ILLEGAL SALE OF A CAR, ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120806-0609-CC 004/ 50.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: CLAIM Comment PCF2: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for BOLDS, SHARITA : Case Payment Receipt # 201208060609 BOLDS, SHARITA $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for BOLDS, SHARITA : Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial: BOLDS, SHARITA; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less