This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:15:17 (UTC).

SHAIDA SABIN V. THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 SHAIDA SABIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McKenna, Kathleen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6648

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

McKenna, Kathleen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHAIDA SABIN

Foster City, CA 94404

SABIN, SHAIDA

Defendants

THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS

2231 Delvin Way

South San Francisco, CA 94080

ISLAND J HOA

Redwood City, CA 94063

THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS C/O JACQUELINE JACCOBBERGER

ISLAND J HOA C/O THE MANOR ASSOCIATION, INC ATTN: SANDRA B LONG,AMS,CMCA,CCAM

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

FILING Comment SSUB: SUBPOENA/SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED ON JACQUELINE JACCOBBERGER BY BRUCE SABIN ON 07/02/12. HEARING DATE: 09/28/12

Conversion Hearing.

HEARING NOTICE (3) Judicial Officer McKenna Kathleen Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (CONTINUANCE).

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PCSP: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF SABIN SERVED BY PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS ON 07/02/12 COSTS $0.00, HEARING DATE 07/30/12.

Conversion Hearing.

HEARING NOTICE (2) Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (CONTINUANCE).

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSC1: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF SABIN SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL AS TO ISLAND J HOA ON 07/02/12; HEARING DATE 07/30/12. SIGNED FOR BY SIGNATURE ILLEGIBLE ON CERTIFIED MAIL.

Order.

ORDER Comment O2: ORDER ORD ON RQT FOR CT ORD FILED ON 07/19/12 THE REQUEST IS DENIED. SIGNED BY COMM: MCKENNA ON 08/06/12 FILED.

Order.

ORDER (2) Comment O2: ORDER ORD ON RQT FOR CT ORD FILED ON 07/18/12 THE REQUEST IS DENIED. SIGNED BY COMM: MCKENNA ON 08/06/12 FILED.

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment RCSC: REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY ISLAND J HOA

Request.

REQUEST (3) Comment REQ: REQUEST COURT ORD & ANS FILED BY PLTF.

Order.

ORDER (3) Comment O2: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER SC-105A SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER MCKENNA ON 08/16/12 FILED.

Request.

REQUEST (4) Comment REQ: REQUEST CT ORD & ANS FILED BY ISLAND J HOA.

Amended.

AMENDED FILING Comment AMEN: AMENDED SC-105 REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY SHAIDA SABIN.

Conversion Action.

REQUEST (5) Comment RCSC: REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY SHAIDA SABIN

Request.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQ: REQUEST FOR CT ORD & ANS FILED BY PLTF.

Conversion Hearing.

HEARING NOTICE Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS C/O JACQUELINE JACCOBBERGER; ISLAND J HOA C/O THE MANOR ASSOCIATION INC ATTN: SANDRA B LONG,AMS,CMCA,CCAM; Awarded Against: SABIN, SHAIDA; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 11/13/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF SABIN FOR THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS, ISLAND J HOA JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF SABIN AGAINST SHAIDA SABIN DEFENDANT(S) THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS, ISLAND J HOA DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/13/12 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES 11/13/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JED: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/13/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment DDNOP: DEFENDANT(S) THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS ISLAND J HOA DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF SABIN AGAINST SHAIDA SABIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF SABIN FOR THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS ISLAND J HOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment SAS: SET ASIDE SUBMISSION OF HSCC ON 10/15/12 AT 01:30.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY REBECCA HUERTA ON 10/15/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0927-CK 004/ 50.00 007/ 10.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Comment PCF2: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • Financial info for ISLAND J HOA C/O THE MANOR ASSOCIATION, INC ATTN: SANDRA B LONG,AMS,CMCA,CCAM : Case Payment Receipt # 201207170813 ISLAND J HOA C/O THE MANOR ASSOCIATION, INC ATTN: SANDRA B LONG,AMS,CMCA,CCAM $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • Financial info for ISLAND J HOA C/O THE MANOR ASSOCIATION, INC ATTN: SANDRA B LONG,AMS,CMCA,CCAM : Transaction Assessment $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • Financial: ISLAND J HOA C/O THE MANOR ASSOCIATION, INC ATTN: SANDRA B LONG,AMS,CMCA,CCAM; Total Financial Assessment $10.00; Total Payments and Credits $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • Financial info for SABIN, SHAIDA : Case Payment Receipt # 201207300925 SABIN, SHAIDA $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • Financial info for SABIN, SHAIDA : Transaction Assessment $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for SABIN, SHAIDA : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260927 SABIN, SHAIDA $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for SABIN, SHAIDA : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: SABIN, SHAIDA; Total Financial Assessment $70.00; Total Payments and Credits $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less