This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 12:03:12 (UTC).

SCOTT BAKER vs. GILEAD SCIENCES, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 SCOTT BAKER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GILEAD SCIENCES, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2479

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baker, Scott

Defendants

Gilead Sciences

GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOLUMPHY, MARK C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BAKER, SCOTT; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-023150-HOJ Baker, Scott $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for BAKER, SCOTT; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; BAKER, SCOTT; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Molumphy, Mark Cotton