This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:59:34 (UTC).

SCHNEIDER PROP. vs JOHN DEMPSEY,et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 SCHNEIDER PROP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHN DEMPSEY. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6401

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES, LP

Defendant

DEMPSEY, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIS, DANIEL T

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES LP AS TO JOHN DEMPSEY.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF DANIEL T. PARIS PURSUANT TO CCP 712.010 FILED BY SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES LP

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES LP SERVED ON JOHN DEMPSEY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/19/12.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES LP; Awarded Against: DEMPSEY, JOHN; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/28/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES, LP FOR SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES, LP JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES, LP AGAINST JOHN DEMPSEY JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 1421 BELLEVUE AVE #208 BURLINGAME CA. 94010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120829-0008-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment WPRP1: (L) WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED FOR COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFPP: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 1421 BELLEVUE AVE #208 BURLINGAME CA. 94010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES LP AGAINST JOHN DEMPSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES LP FOR SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JOAF1: JUDGMENT ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: JUDGMENT Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF DANIEL T. PARIS PURSUANT TO CCP 712.010 FILED BY SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES LP

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice. Additional Info: Comment UDN: UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING NOTICES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES PER CCP 1161.2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Case Sealed by Order. Additional Info: Comment SEALUD: UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SEALED PER CCP 1161.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment TUDM: (L) TRACK ASSIGNMENT: UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DRAD1: DAILY RENTAL VALUE $31.67; ADDRESS 1421 BELLEVUE AVE #208 BURLINGAME CA. 94010; 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 1421 BELLEVUE AVE #208 BURLINGAME CA94010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Financial info for SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES, LP : Case Payment Receipt # 201208210021 SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES, LP $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Financial info for SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES, LP : Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Financial: SCHNEIDER PROPERTIES, LP; Total Financial Assessment $240.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less