This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 22:43:11 (UTC).

SCHINDLER ELEVATOR COMPANY vs. THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 SCHINDLER ELEVATOR COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Grandsaert, John L., Karesh, Jonathan E., ETEZADI and KARESH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5529

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Grandsaert, John L.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Not Yet Classifieds

ETEZADI

KARESH

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WENG, WENWEN

KINSEY, RICHARD DAVID

GABRIELLE, ROSE

KLESCHEVNIKOV, ALEKSEY P.

THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

KEISSLER, ROSA

ANTONY, CHAO

PRAKASHCHANDRA, BRAHMBH

CHEN, SHUO

LI, MANQUN

SHI, HAOFAN

PATEL, MANAN

MAX AND TRUDI BOSEL FAMILY TRUST

KEISSLER, HANS

MCCORMICK, DAVID

FOSTER, STEPHEN

BRAMLETT EUGENE W&W TRUST

FERDOWS GHODSI TRUST

SHAHDAR, LEILI

THE GHODSI FERDOWS TRUST

280 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Lee, Paul K.

LEE, PAUL K

Other Attorneys

STAPLES, WILLIAM H

STAPLES, WILLIAM H.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Case Management Conference.

*CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: STAPLES, WILLIAM H

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Answer (No Fee).

Answer (No Fee) ANSWER TO THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION'S CROSS COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION'S CROSS COMPLAINT

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Complaint.

Complaint Complaint

Stipulation.

Stipulation TO CONTINUE TRIAL Comment TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAUL K. Comment TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAUL K. LEE

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTIO Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC, NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS), CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens).

Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal Comment Jury Trial time estimate; 7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; SCHINDLER ELEVATOR COMPANY; DOES 1 - 10; ROES 1 - 10; Comment: AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION- EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES ANDCOSTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: SCHINDLER ELEVATOR COMPANY; THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; SCHMIDT CHRISTINA; GEITNER, MICHAEL; SHI, HAOFAN; KLESCHEVNIKOV, ALEKSEY P.; THE GHODSI FERDOWS TRUST; KINSEY, RICHARD DAVID; FALCIANO, THOMAS; FALCIANO, JOAN; BRAMLETT EUGENE W&W TRUST; MAX AND TRUDI BOSEL FAMILY TRUST; FERDOWS GHODSI TRUST; KEISSLER, HANS; KEISSLER, ROSA; MCCORMICK, DAVID; LI, YAN; LILA LEHTO TRUST; ANTONY, CHAO; CHAO, ANGELA; DOURAGHY, HALEH; WENG, WENWEN; CHEN, SHUO; SHUM, SHUI FONG; GABRIELLE, ROSE; SYLVIA LAU TRUST; SHUEH, TRICIA TE SHING; MIRCHI, MAHIN; FOSTER, STEPHEN; COOKE, MARIA TERESA; SUBEDAR, FEROZ; SHAHDAR, LEILI; SHAHDAR, PARISSA; PATEL, MANAN; PRAKASHCHANDRA, BRAHMBH; AMAK, PIRET; BEMAUL, RONALD; PHAM, KAREN; LI, MANQUN; LU, JIAN JUN; LEE FRANKLIN LIVING TRUST; SHANDONAY, MARY; TORRES, DOUGLAS R.; MYMA LACSON LIVING TRUST; KHOSHNEVIS, SUZAN R.; KAREEM, OMER A.; CITY OF BELMONT; PEREZ, R.; MORADI, ELHAM; KAWAR MUNA FAMILY TRUST; FARIBA FARZANEH TRUST; THE HAMID AND NILOUFAR FARZANEH TRUST; VENTI, JUNE; KUNI, SATOKO; MARY ANN MOLTENI TRUST; STANLEY HUMPHREY TRUST; ROBERT RE LIVING TRUST; LUCIE JENCEK TRUST; SHILMAN, ELLA; SHILMAN, NAUM; GHORASHI, MAHNI; HUMPHREY, MARY JANE; ASSEFA, KARINA; NIKNAM, NICKY; WOON, PAUL; WOON, LIN-SUN; DAHLIN, NICOLE; GAST, TIMOTHY M.; CHIAO CHUNG LIANG & CHI S TRUST; COLE, KENNETH; ZUZANKA, DMITRY; ZUZANKA, VOSKY; GUNAWAN, LITA; LIU, KWANG; CHIEN, HUMEL; ROSEHIARY DUCKETT TRUST; MEI, DAN; YING, MING; ROTHENBERG, ZAHRA; YUZHANIN, ALEKSEY; SFRAZO, DONNA L; AKRAN ATRI-GHOMIZADEH TRUST; NOSRATI, ALI; AARON A. RANG TRUST; HAO, JIANHUA; MARSHALL & ANDERSEN TRUST; YOUSSEFI, HELGA; YOUSEFFI, DARIUSH; BANAIE, SAEED; DONALD AND SILVAN TORRE TRUST; KOMISSAROV, PAVEL; KOMISSAROV, IRINA; KILROY, JEANNINE M.; SHERWIN, WILLIAM; RICKY GHILARDUCCI TRUST; PHYLLIS IACAMPO FAMILY TRUST; SO, LAI P; EDWARD NELSON TRUST; MICHELSEN, MICHELLE P.; KIM, CHUNG IM; THE EUGENE TSIANG TRUST; MYRA ALICE STRENG TRUST; DANIEL MARTINELLI TRUST; BRASEL, KEITH; BRASEL, ALLAN; DOLORES TRUST; VOLKHOVER, VLADIMIR; VOLKHOVER, PAVLOVICH; WANG, JONATHAN; LO, WINNIE; JEAN FOX FRIEDMAN TRUST; SCHMIDT, KENNETH; YORIKO, BIRDIE YORIKO; JANET LAIN TRUST; JYE-NIEN, MICHAEL; YU, JOAN L; BARBARA ZANETTE TRUST; THE PAUL K. SEGERHAMMAR TRUST; VICTOR G MARAS INC.; ROGHMANN, LEE; XUNHUA, SARAH; CHUI, FRANCIS; CHUI, LINDA; KIM, INKNANG; POLISSKY, YURI; POLISSKY, HULA; SEMAKOV, ALEXEY; BAHRAINI, JOOBIN; JOY A. FORD TRUST; KATHLEEN PODOLSKY TRUST; POWERS, MARIANN; GLENDA DASMALCHI TRUST; WITCHER, RODNEY; BONAM, COURTNEY; POLYAKOV, MASHA; POLYAKOV, MICHAEL; KIM LIOU TRUST; WINNIE ANN BIOCINO TRUST; YOUSEFFI, HELGA; YOUSEFFI, DARIUSH; CHEN, ROSALYN; KURUVILLA, ROHAN; DESHPANDE, RUCHI; DELVECCHIO, ROBERT; PIERCE AND AIMEE FONG TRUST; FENBERG, MELISSA; PIATROUSKI, HANNA; PIATROUSKI, ALIAKSEI; SIMIN HADAYAT TRUST; TAHERIAN, IRAJ; TAHERIAN, HENGAMEH; KANTAWALA, KAUSHAL K.; BON, SONIA K.; SALLES, BELINDA; SALLES, JUDE; MAHMOUD OLOUMI TRUST; RUGGIERO, LISA A.; YANCHER, VLADIMIR; CHERVINSKAYA, OLGA; KEIHANI, IRAJ; MANDAVI, SHIRIN; FRENZEL, CONNIE; LUVISOTTI, MAURO; YAO, EDWARD; RUANO-YAO, MIMA; YELENA MALAGA TRUST; SUZANNE MOZAYENI TRUST; DOWLAT EZZATI TRUST; DAVID AND MARK HAUMESSER TRUST; OVACIK, AYSE; ROBERT GEORGE GOTTSCHALK TRUST; BERRY, LEONARD R.; EUGENE BRAMLETT TRUST; BOEDEKER, SUZANNE; CAPUTO, CHRISTOPHER; SI, XIU FAN; JOHNSON, SEAN L.; WENTWORTH, WILLIAM P; GUIAO, DEBORAH; VIVIEN AND ALEX CHEN TRUST; STRAUSS, MICHAEL; JULU, MAUDE LYLA; CALVO, VINCENT R.; NATHAN TEISMAN AND VENITA CHANDRA TRUST; CALVO, VINCENT R; TEISMAN, NATHAN; VENITA CHANDRA TRUST; B. BETYAGHOUB LIVING TRUST; CARPENTER, DONNA; FARHAD KHALILI TRUST; SHAHRZAD HAGHPARAST TRUST; JI, XIA; NG, ANDY HUNG; SHIMIKERI, KISHORE JONNALAGADDA; EDWARD TUOHY TRUST; DEBORAH COVELL TRUST; SHUEH, TRISHA TE SHING; STEPHEN CARROLL TRUST; GIOVANNI TEMPESTA TRUST; TAO, ZUOYU; SOLYANIK, TATYANA; SOLYANIK, GENNADIY; LI, CATHY Y.; BRITTMARIE STEELE TRUST; CITY OF BELMONT; WILSON, BETTYE L.; KUTAKA-KENNEDY, JOY; ZAKERI, MOE CLEMENTS; JOSEPH P. FRANK TRUST; ZHUANG, LIMING; YEE, STEPHANIE; YEE, LARISSA; BAYLOCK, NICHOLAS M.; ZHU, YUAN-XIANG; YU, SHURONG; MILMAN, NOAH; KLEINER, JESSICA; TONG, STEPHEN; TONG, ANDREA; DRYER, DAVID CHRISTOPHER; SHENOY, SAPAN; KAMATH, DEVIKA; LOPEZ, RICHARD S.; RAISNER, RYAN M.; EUGENE TSIANG TRUST; NANCY SYLVIA BARNETT TRUST; MORAN, JOSHUA R.; HENDRIX, MATTHEW; HENDRIX, MICHAEL; CHEHEREGOSHA, ALI; WILLIAM HENRY GREEN TRUST; MOBARREZ, NAHID; HEIDARZADEH, BALLARAK; GONG, NORMAN; SUSAN LEE SUSAN TRUST; JACOBS, ELIZABETH; JACOBS, CHRISTI; MARJAN TEYMOURTASH TRUST; MIOCHNIK, MARGA; MIROCHNIK, DIMITRI; RAHNEMA, FERESHTEH; ZARGHAMI, FATEMEH; BOROUMAND, MINOU; BOROUMAND, ENAYATAL; RUTH AND SCHMIDT TRUST; MINHAS, GURJIT; CHEEMA, RUPINDER; KRISHNAMURTHY, DEVAI; AYYAPAN, UMA; SOARES, CYNTHIA; MILLS, JENNIFER; ATASHIRANG, GHASSEM K.; FERRARI, JACK; FERRARI, KIMBERLY; TRAYLOS, BEVERLY J.; MARIE LENORA LEE-MASIS TRUST; NAREN, DARSHAN REVAR; YU, ALLISON JUDY; MALEK, NADERI ALIZADEH; SAWCZUK, SUSAN M.; AZARNOOSH, PETER; LAM, REBECCA ANNE; RONDA DAVE TYCER TRUST; MATSUUR, SCOTT TADASHI; JASMIN, ISET; DRBAL, VLADIMIR; DRBAL, ANNELIESE; KULKARNI, PADMAKAR; KULKARNI, SUMA; FEDOSOVA, OLGA; BOROUMAND, BEHZAD; BOROUMAND, TATIYANA; DANIEL ADAM COROPASSI TRUST; LOMBARD, ALEXANDER; BIDDLE, STEPHANIE; VISAN, MIHAI; CHENG, CECIL; MARGARETE BODMER TRUST; CHANG, JOHN; JOHN YU AND PING WEN TRUST; CHANG, ORPHA; ENRIQUEZ, FARID; DABLIZ, KAREN; CHOU, AMY L.; HOSSEINI, ZAHRA; HOSSEINI, ALI AKBAR; HEIDARGHO, VICTOR ANTHONY; HEIDARGHO BOROUMAND TRUST; HAGHIGHI, GHOLAMREZA NAVID; WENMAN, JOHN; RADOST, R.; LUTTRELL, NORMAN W.; DORONIN, OLEG BORISLAYSKAIA; DOES 1-100; DOES 1 - 10; ROES 1 - 10; CHAO, ANTONY; VOSKY, DMITRY; VOSKY, ZUZANKA; PERITORE, VICTOR ANTHONY; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION - EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice- ENTIRE ACTION- EACH PARTY TO BEAR THIER OWN FEES AND COSTS Comment With Prejudice- ENTIRE ACTION- EACH PARTY TO BEAR THIER OWN FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Comment With Prejudice- AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT - THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial. Additional Info: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for SCHINDLER ELEVATOR COMPANY : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-082205-HOJ ONE HOUR DELIVERY SERVICE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for SCHINDLER ELEVATOR COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: SCHINDLER ELEVATOR COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens). Additional Info: Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

| Facsimile: (650) 365-4206

| THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN D. FREDERICK Kevin D. Frederick (CSB #83431) Paul K. Lee (CSB #192812)

605 Middlefield Road o T Redwood City, California 94063-1890 W w1 Telephone: (650) 365-9800 gar AATED COUNTY

JJAN.2 5, 2018

Attorneys for Defendant

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

UNLIMITED JURISDICTION

SCHINDLER ELEVATOR COMPANY, ) Case No.: 17 CIV 05529 ) Plaintiff(s), % Vs. ) CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: )

THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ) 2) BREACH OF WARRANTY OF FITNESS

ASSOCIATION, et al, ) 3) BREACH OF WARRANTY OF

MERCHANABILITY

Defendant(s). ) 4) NEGLIGENCE

) 5) DECLARATORY RELIEF THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS 3

ASSOCIATION, % Cross-Complainant(s), ) - ) ; 17— CIV - 05529 VS. ) | gfoT: Complaint

- FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION BREACH OF CONTRACT

12. The ASSOCIATION incorporates by reference all previous paragraphs of this complaint as though set forth in full herein.

13. In October, 2014, the ASSOCIATION and SCHINDLER entered into a written contract (hereinafter “Contract”). A true and correct copy of the Contract is attached hereto as Exhibit A.

14. SCHINDLER agreed to modernize the elevators located at the ASSOCIATION.

15. In exchange for elevator products and services the ASSOCIATION agreed to pay SCHINDLER $887,106.00.

16. The elevator modernization project was to be completed on or before February 28, 2016.

17. SCHINDLER breached the Contract by not completing the project by February 28, 2016, by failing to follow specifications identified in the Contract, and by failing to perform work in a workmanlike manner.

18. The ASSOCIATION paid the defendants approximately $746,995.00 and performed all of its obligations under the Contract, except those of which it is excused from performing due to SCHINDLER’S breach.

19. As alegal, direct, and proximate cause of SCHINDLER’S breach the ASSOCIATION has been dam\aged in an amount to be determined at trial.

| SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION BREACH OF EXPRESS AND IMPLIED WARRANTY OF FITNESS FOR INTENDED USE

20. The ASSOCIATION incorporates by reference all previous paragraphs of this complaint

as though set forth in full herein.

as though set forth in full herein. 21. Atall times herein mentioned and material hereto SCHINDLERmerchant and seller of elevator products and services.

21. Atall times herein mentioned and material hereto SCHINDLERmerchant and seller of elevator products and services.

22. The ASSOCIATION purchased products and services sold by SCHINDLER for the ASSOCIATION.

23. The products sold and services performed by SCHINDLER were not fit for its intended use and was defective as previously alleged herein above.

24. After the ASSOCIATION discovered the defective quality of products and services, the ASSOCIATION gave SCHINDLER due and timely notice of the defective quality of the above- mentioned items. The defendant failed to correct its work.

25. The defects described above were caused by the breaches of express and implied warranties by the defendant.

26. Because of the breaches of express and implied warranties by the defendant the ASSOCIATION has been damaged over in an amount to be determined at trial.

THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION BREACH OF EXPRESS AND IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILITY

27. The ASSOCIATION incorporates by reference all previous paragraphs of this complaint as though set forth in full herein.

28. At all times herein mentioned and material hereto SCHINDLERmerchant and seller of elevator components, the type of merchandise sold to the ASSOCIATION as herein above alleged and described.

29. The ASSOCIATION purchased elevator components from SCHINDLER. SCHINDLER at the time and place of the sale of the elevator components expressly and impliedly warranted that it would be of merchantable quality.

30. However, the elevator components were not properly constructed, and are not of merchantable quality.

31. After the ASSOCIATION discovered the defective quality of the elevator components and SCHINDLER’S work, The ASSOCIATION gave SCHINDLER due and timely notice of the

defective quality of the above-mentioned items. SCHINDLER failed to correct its merchandise or work.

defective quality of the above-mentioned items. SCHINDLER failed to correct its merchandise or work. 32. The defects described above were caused by the breaches of express and implied warranties by the defendants, and each of them.

32. The defects described above were caused by the breaches of express and implied warranties by the defendants, and each of them.

33. Because of the breaches of express and implied warranties by the defendants, and each of them, the ASSOCIATION has been damaged in an amount to be determined at trial.

FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION NEGLIGENCE

34. The ASSOCIATION incorporates by reference all previous paragraphs of this complaint as though set forth in full herein.

35. SCHINDLER carelessly and negligently planned, constructed, modified, inspected, and/or performed work and services at the ASSOCIATION so as to legally cause damage to the Subject Property.

36. Because of the carelessness and negligence of SCHINDLER and as a legal result thereof, The ASSOCIATION has been damaged as previously alleged herein above described.

37. Within the last 3 yea-s The ASSOCIATION discovered the defective work to the Subject Property

38. The defects and damages described herein above were caused by the negligence and careless work performed by the defendants, and each of them.

39. As alegal and proximate result of SCHINDLER'’S negligence the ASSOCIATION has been damaged in an amount to be determined at trial.

FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION

(Declaratory Relief)

40. The ASSOCIATION incorporates by reference all previous paragraphs of this complaint as though set forth in full herein.

41. An actual controversy exists between the parties concerning their respective rights, duties and obligations under the Contract.

42. Unless all the duties and obligations arising out of the Contract are determined in one

proceeding, there will be a multiplicity of actions to determine the rights, duties and obligations of the

proceeding, there will be a multiplicity of actions to determine the rights, duties and obligations of the parties, and the parties will be subjected to an unreasonable burden and risk of irreparable injury if the

parties, and the parties will be subjected to an unreasonable burden and risk of irreparable injury if the

rights of the parties are not determined in this one proceeding.

WHEREFORE, Cross-Complainant prays for judgement against Cross-Defendants as hereinafter

set forth.

REMEDIES SOUGHT

WHEREFORE, Cross-Complainant prays for judgment as follows:

© ® N L A W N

DATED: \ / 2L / (&

For compensatory damages according to proof;

For liquidated damages according to proof;

For interest thereon at the maximum legal rate;

For prejudgment interest on all sums awarded at the maximum legal rate;

A judicial determination of the parties’ obligations pursuant to the Contract; For costs of suit incurred herein;

For professional, consultant and technical fees according to proof;

For damages to personal property according to proof;

For attorney’s fees; and

For such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper.

THE BELMONT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION