This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:16:00 (UTC).

SARAH A NUEHRING AND TIMOTHY J NUEHRING

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 SARAH A NUEHRING AND TIMOTHY J NUEHRING was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Greenberg, Susan, Franchi, Don R and Franchi, Don R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8184

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Greenberg, Susan

Franchi, Don R

Franchi, Don R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NUEHRING, SARAH ANN

Respondent

NUEHRING, TIMOTHY JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: NUEHRING TIMOTHY JOHN; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: NUEHRING, SARAH ANN; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Stipulation. Additional Info: Comment STIP1: (S) STIPULATIONWAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ASW1: APPEARANCE STIPULATION AND WAIVERS (RESPONSE ALREADY FILED) FILED BY SARAH ANN NUEHRING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Comment DDUJ: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment NEJM: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment NEJM: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment MSE: MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 02/08/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Comment JNM: JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED; MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 02/08/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY FC BERNAL ON 02/08/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment SPFO: FLF SHALL PREPARE A FORMAL ORDER CONSISTENT WITH THE ORDERS HEREIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Notice of ADR. Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY SARAH ANN NUEHRING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0237-CC 184/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership. Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Financial info for NUEHRING, TIMOTHY JOHN : Case Payment Receipt # 201207310411 NUEHRING, TIMOTHY JOHN $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Financial info for NUEHRING, TIMOTHY JOHN : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Financial: NUEHRING, TIMOTHY JOHN; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for NUEHRING, SARAH ANN : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260237 NUEHRING, SARAH ANN $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for NUEHRING, SARAH ANN : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: NUEHRING, SARAH ANN; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less