This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/20/2022 at 03:22:19 (UTC).

SANDRA ARRIETA vs. GENENTECH, INC

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 SANDRA ARRIETA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GENENTECH, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5352

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARRIETA, SANDRA

Defendants

1-10, DOES

GENENTECH, INC.. a Delaware corporation

ROCHE, INC., a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERETZ, YOSEF

Defendant Attorney

REED, TIMOTHY L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET, ETC.. Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET, ETC..

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC Order Continue - Not Yet at Issue - File Copy

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET, ETC.. Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET, ETC..

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - no CMC statement..; Additional Info: CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - no CMC statement..; Additional Info: CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for ROCHE, INC., a Delaware corporation; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; ROCHE, INC., a Delaware corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GENENTECH, INC.. a Delaware corporation; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for GENENTECH, INC.. a Delaware corporation; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-018318-HOJ GENENTECH, INC.. a Delaware corporation $870.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; GENENTECH, INC.. a Delaware corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees.; Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARRIETA, SANDRA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-040929-HOJ ARRIETA, SANDRA $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARRIETA, SANDRA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; ARRIETA, SANDRA; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roche is a litigant

Latest cases where Genentech, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED, TIMOTHY L