This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/08/2022 at 14:05:17 (UTC).

San Bruno Town Center Partnership vs. Lowe's HIW, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 San Bruno Town Center Partnership filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lowe's HIW, Inc . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V. Raymond and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4775

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V. Raymond

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Bruno Town Center Partnership

Defendants

Lowe's HIW, Inc.

Khoury Lowes, LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAUMAN, CHRISTOPHER J

Defendant Attorney

BAIARDO, ALICIA A

 

Court Documents

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment Answer AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN COMPLEX CASES ONLY), AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ADR INFORMATION SHEET, AND BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SERVED TO: AGENT FOR SERVICE ISAM H. KOURY'S WIFE - JANE KOURY

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN COMPLE Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN COMPLEX CASES ONLY), AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ADR INFORMATION SHEET, AND BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SERVED TO: AGENT FOR SERVICE- CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY- KOY SAEHAO/ STAFF SPECIALIST- AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE DOE 1 as LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC Comment NAMING DOE/ROE DOE 1 as LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment Answer AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN COMPLE Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (SERVED IN COMPLEX CASES ONLY), AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES (CIVIL), NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ADR INFORMATION SHEET, AND BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SERVED TO: AGENT FOR SERVICE- CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY- KOY SAEHAO/ STAFF SPECIALIST- AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral.; Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - no CMC statement..; Additional Info: CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint.; Additional Info: Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE DOE 1 as LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC Comment NAMING DOE/ROE DOE 1 as LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for San Bruno Town Center Partnership; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-037222-HOJ San Bruno Town Center Partnership $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for San Bruno Town Center Partnership; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; San Bruno Town Center Partnership; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWE'S HIW INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAIARDO, ALICIA A