This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 01:09:13 (UTC).

SAMANTHA AI vs. LU Zhao , et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 SAMANTHA AI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LU Zhao . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3260

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AI, SAMANTHA

SHEN, MENGSHI

Defendants

Zhao , LU

ZHAO, LUKE

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE, PAUL K.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Declaration of Due Diligence.

Declaration of Due Diligence

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT served on JANE DOE OCCUPANT Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT served on JANE DOE, OCCUPANT

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 1/10/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 1/10/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Request For.

Request For Court Judgment Comment Court Judgment

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment.

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 Comment pursuant to CCP 585

Proposed Judgment Received.

Proposed Judgment Received DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENTFWD TO DEPT. # 23 Comment DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT FWD TO DEPT. # 23

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 3/15/2022 at 10:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 3/15/2022 at 10:00 a.m.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 3/15/2022 at 10:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 3/15/2022 at 10:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - other/motion pending.. Additional Info: Comment Default Court Judgment packet forwarded to Dept. 23 on 11/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: Does 1-10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received. Additional Info: Proposed Judgment Received DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENTFWD TO DEPT. # 23 Comment DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT FWD TO DEPT. # 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 Comment pursuant to CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For. Additional Info: Request For Court Judgment Comment Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties). Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketJudgment Received. Additional Info: Comment COURT JUDGMENT PACKET

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence. Additional Info: Declaration of Due Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AI, SAMANTHA : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-023661-HOJ Shen , Mengshi $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AI, SAMANTHA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: AI, SAMANTHA; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE, PAUL K.