This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 03:47:34 (UTC).

SALVADOR SAJUAN CUEVAS vs. ALL FENCE COMPANY INC., et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 SALVADOR SAJUAN CUEVAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALL FENCE COMPANY INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0228

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUEVAS, SALVADOR SAJUAN

Defendants

ALL FENCE COMPANY INC.

DOES 1-30 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARABI, PARVIZ

Defendant Attorney

GELLER, JASON A

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal ENTIRE ACTION With Prejudice Comment ENTIRE ACTION, With Prejudice

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing RESCHEDULING OF MSC Comment RESCHEDULING OF MSC

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re RESCHEDULING OF MSC Comment RESCHEDULING OF MSC

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: DARABI, PARVIZ

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice.

Notice OF JURY FEE. Comment OF JURY FEE.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (PER REQUEST OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 03/03/17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal ENTIRE ACTION With Prejudice Comment ENTIRE ACTION, With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing RESCHEDULING OF MSC Comment RESCHEDULING OF MSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing re. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re RESCHEDULING OF MSC Comment RESCHEDULING OF MSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2017
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • ADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment 21 ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2016
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Financial info for ALL FENCE COMPANY INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-033399-HOJ ALL FENCE COMPANY INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Financial info for ALL FENCE COMPANY INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Financial: ALL FENCE COMPANY INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for CUEVAS, SALVADOR SAJUAN : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-052546-HOJ CUEVAS, SALVADOR SAJUAN $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for CUEVAS, SALVADOR SAJUAN : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-052361-HOJ CUEVAS, SALVADOR SAJUAN $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for CUEVAS, SALVADOR SAJUAN : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Financial info for CUEVAS, SALVADOR SAJUAN : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-025552-HOJ CUEVAS, SALVADOR SAJUAN $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Financial info for CUEVAS, SALVADOR SAJUAN : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Financial: CUEVAS, SALVADOR SAJUAN; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less