This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 15:49:57 (UTC).

SAFEWAY, INC. vs. JANITORIAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 SAFEWAY, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JANITORIAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3771

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFEWAY, INC.

Defendants

JANITORIAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES, INC.

KING JANITORIAL EQUIPMENT SERVICES

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUGHES, DAVID W.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, AMENDED SUMMO Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, AMENDED SUMMONS, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC..

Amended Summons Issued / Filed.

Amended Summons Issued / Filed FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

First Amended Complaint.

First Amended Complaint

Notice.

Notice OF ACTION FILED Comment OF ACTION FILED

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice.

Notice CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS Comment CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, AMENDED SUMMO Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, AMENDED SUMMONS, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Amended Summons Issued / Filed FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint. Additional Info: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice. Additional Info: Notice OF ACTION FILED Comment OF ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for SAFEWAY, INC. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-028042-HOJ SAFEWAY, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for SAFEWAY, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: SAFEWAY, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice. Additional Info: Notice CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS Comment CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where King Janitorial Equipment Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Janitorial Equipment Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUGHES, DAVID W.