This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/22/2018 at 09:58:57 (UTC).

SAFEWAY, INC. VS. DALE PLUMBING, INC. ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2009 SAFEWAY, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DALE PLUMBING, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, Scott, Joseph C, Scott, Joseph C. and Dylina, Steven L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4849

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Scott, Joseph C

Scott, Joseph C.

Dylina, Steven L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFEWAY, INC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MICHAEL MECHANICAL, INC.

DALE PLUMBING, INC.,

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ROUNTREE PLUMBING AND HEATING,INC.

MICHAEL MECHANICAL, INC.

DALE PLUMBING, INC.,

ROES 101-200, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALL, ROBERT E.

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

STRONG, DAVID L.

NIELSEN, THOMAS D

WARD, KENNETH C.

GOODMAN, JOSHUA S

YEH, PAIGE

 

Court Documents

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MICHAEL MECHANICAL INC. FILED BY ROUNTREE PLUMBING AND HEATING, I Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MICHAEL MECHANICAL, INC. FILED BY ROUNTREE PLUMBING AND HEATING, INC., REPRESENTED BY KENNETH C. WARD

Conversion Action.

SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT ISSUED AND FILED (UNLIMITED). Comment SCC: SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT, ISSUED AND FILED (UNLIMITED).

Conversion Action.

(S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROUNTREE PLUMBING AND HEATINGINC. FILED Comment CC: (S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROUNTREE PLUMBING AND HEATING,INC. FILED

Conversion Action.

SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT ISSUED AND FILED (UNLIMITED). Comment SCC: SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT, ISSUED AND FILED (UNLIMITED).

Conversion Action.

(S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MICHAEL MECHANICAL INC. FILED Comment CC: (S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MICHAEL MECHANICAL, INC. FILED

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DALE PLUMBING INC., FILED BY MICHAEL MECHANICAL, INC., REPRESENTE Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DALE PLUMBING, INC., FILED BY MICHAEL MECHANICAL, INC., REPRESENTED BY DAVID L. STRONG

Conversion Action.

SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT ISSUED AND FILED (UNLIMITED). Comment SCC: SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT, ISSUED AND FILED (UNLIMITED).

Conversion Action.

(S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DALE PLUMBING INC., FILED Comment CC: (S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DALE PLUMBING, INC., FILED

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF SAFEWAY INC FILED BY DALE PLUMBING, INC.,, REPRESENTED BY NANCY A. CHIL Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF SAFEWAY, INC FILED BY DALE PLUMBING, INC.,, REPRESENTED BY NANCY A. CHILLAG

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF SAFEWAY INC FILED BY MICHAEL MECHANICAL, INC., REPRESENTED BY DAVID L. Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF SAFEWAY, INC FILED BY MICHAEL MECHANICAL, INC., REPRESENTED BY DAVID L. STRONG

Affidavit.

AFFIDAVIT OF DELIVERY BY MAIL BY A. DEGLIANTONI FILED Comment AFFI: AFFIDAVIT OF DELIVERY BY MAIL BY A. DEGLIANTONI FILED

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dispositioned; Party; Name: ROES 101-200 INCLUSIVE; Comment: 0004 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0004 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dispositioned; Party; Name: Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: SAFEWAY INC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: Comment REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROUNTREE PLUMBING AND HEATING INC. WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CODWP: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MICHAEL MECHANICAL INC. AND ALL PARTIES DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: Comment REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MICHAEL MECHANICAL INC. WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CODWP: COMPLAINT OF SAFEWAY INC AND ALL PARTIES DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: Comment REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT OF SAFEWAY INC WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • Document. Additional Info: Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2009
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit. Additional Info: AFFIDAVIT OF DELIVERY BY MAIL BY A. DEGLIANTONI FILED Comment AFFI: AFFIDAVIT OF DELIVERY BY MAIL BY A. DEGLIANTONI FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 090610-0121-CK 026/ 350.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Financial info for SAFEWAY, INC : Case Payment Receipt # 200906100121 SAFEWAY, INC $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Financial info for SAFEWAY, INC : Transaction Assessment $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • Financial: SAFEWAY, INC; Total Financial Assessment $350.00; Total Payments and Credits $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALE PLUMBING, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALL, ROBERT E