This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:14:59 (UTC).

SAFE2CORE, INC V CARLOS ALBERTO GARCIA MANZANARES,

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 SAFE2CORE, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARLOS ALBERTO GARCIA MANZANARES. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McKenna, Kathleen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6645

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

McKenna, Kathleen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFE2CORE, INC

3851 Charter Park Drive, Ste M

San Jose, CA 95136

Defendants

CARLOS ALBERTO GARCIA MANZANARES

GARCIA MANZANARES, CARLOS ALBERTO

C & E ELECTRIC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSSN: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF SAFE2CORE INC SUB-SERVED BY NON REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER AS TO CARLOS ALBERTO GARCIA MANZANARES ON 07/20/12; BY SUB-SERVING MIRIAM MAGOS. COSTS $40.00, HEARING DATE 08/10/12

Conversion Hearing.

HEARING NOTICE Judicial Officer McKenna Kathleen Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: GARCIA MANZANARES CARLOS ALBERTO; Comment: 0001 PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM; Party; Name: SAFE2CORE, INC; Comment: 0001 PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY JANE TORRES ON 10/05/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CDWOPE: CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PTYNP: SAFE2CORE INC, CARLOS ALBERTO GARCIA MANZANARES NOT PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer SUPERIOR COURT JUDGE SAN MATEO COUNTY Comment JPTCR1: JUDGE PRO TEM: JOHN COONEY PRESIDING. CLERK: JANE M. TORRES. COURT REPORTER: NONE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: Original Type Small Claims Hearing Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment Dept: SCC SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY KDUERRE ON 08/10/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2012
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: Original Type Small Claims Hearing Judicial Officer McKenna Kathleen Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Conversion Continuance Comment Dept: SCC SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSSN: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF SAFE2CORE INC SUB-SERVED BY NON REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER AS TO CARLOS ALBERTO GARCIA MANZANARES ON 07/20/12; BY SUB-SERVING MIRIAM MAGOS. COSTS $40.00, HEARING DATE 08/10/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ACRC: AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $3740.00. REASON FOR CLAIM: FOR CONCRETE SCANNING & CUTTING SERVICES, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0795-CC 004/ 50.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Comment PCF2: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for SAFE2CORE, INC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260795 SAFE2CORE, INC $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for SAFE2CORE, INC : Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: SAFE2CORE, INC; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less