This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 15:18:37 (UTC).

R.V. Stich Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION vs. Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 R filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Stich Construction, Inc A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S and Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3281

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R.V. Stich Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AIMCO Leahy Apartments, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

C.M. CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERB, HANS W.

Defendant Attorney

ROONEY, KEVIN F.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES; NOTICE OF CASE MAN Comment NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; COMPLAINT; SUMMONS served on Jane Doe person in charge

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MAN Comment NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS THE ACTION IS "AT ISSUE" AND CASE IS ORDERED TO ADR; AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING served on VIVIAN WENG, PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; AND REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; AND REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Order.

Order ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; AND REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; AND REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE NAME OF PARTY SERVED Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE, NAME OF PARTY SERVED DOES NOT MATCH THE COMPLAINT

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-028060-HOJ AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES; NOTICE OF CASE MAN Comment NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; COMPLAINT; SUMMONS served on Jane Doe person in charge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MAN Comment NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS THE ACTION IS "AT ISSUE" AND CASE IS ORDERED TO ADR; AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING served on VIVIAN WENG, PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; AND REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; AND REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE NAME OF PARTY SERVED Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE, NAME OF PARTY SERVED DOES NOT MATCH THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for R.V. Stich Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-023795-HOJ R.V. Stich Construction, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for R.V. Stich Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: R.V. Stich Construction, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R.V. Stich Construction, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where AIMCO LEAHY SQUARE APARTMENTS, LLC is a litigant