Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:55:43 (UTC).

RON CHAVIRA vs. GUITTARD CHOCOLATE CP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 RON CHAVIRA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GUITTARD CHOCOLATE CP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L. and Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2817

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVIRA, RON

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GUITTARD CHOCOLATE CP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 20

CHEROKEE FREIGHT LINES

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CHEROKEE FREIGHT LINES

ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEST, JOSEPH, ESQ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ELZA, LAURIE J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS, ADR PACKAGE, CROSS-COMPLAINT, COPY OF UNDERLYING Comment SUMMONS, ADR PACKAGE, CROSS-COMPLAINT, COPY OF UNDERLYING SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, BLANK PROOF OF SERVICE, SERVED ON BARBARA STEVENS, PAYROLL CLERK, CHEROKE FLREIGHT LINES

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/10/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 12/06/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM'S STREET ADDRESS Comment NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM'S STREET ADDRESS

Notice.

Notice of CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY Comment of CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/04/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice.

Notice OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY Comment OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement CMC 6/6 Comment CMC 6/6

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 6/6/19 Comment CMC 6/6/19

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: GUITTARD CHOCOLATE CP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; CHEROKEE FREIGHT LINES; ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE; Comment: Dismissal as to CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GUITTARD CHOCOLATE COMPANY ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Master Calendar - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIAMTE 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment 11 SENT FOR SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • 10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • 10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • ADR Stipulation and Order Due in Clerk's Office.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial. Additional Info: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Financial info for GUITTARD CHOCOLATE CP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-045305-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Financial info for GUITTARD CHOCOLATE CP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Financial info for GUITTARD CHOCOLATE CP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Financial: GUITTARD CHOCOLATE CP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CHAVIRA, RON : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037486-HOJ JANNEY & JANNEY ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CHAVIRA, RON : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: CHAVIRA, RON; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less