Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/19/2021 at 00:53:38 (UTC).

ROIC California, LLC vs. Tech Rocks, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 ROIC California, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tech Rocks, LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Buchwald, Gerald J., Buchwald, Gerald J, Foiles, Robert D and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3962

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Buchwald, Gerald J

Foiles, Robert D

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROIC California, LLC

Defendants

DOES 1 - 10, INCLUSIVE

Tech Rocks, LLC

Desuasido, Al;exander Vincent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SULLIVAN, GARY W.

MERINO, ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

BUCK, TYLER J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.

Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference on 07/19/21 at 9:00 am. Comment on 07/19/21 at 9:00 am.

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: GARY W. SULLIVANNew Attorney: ALEXANDER MERINO Comment Former Attorney: GARY W. SULLIVAN New Attorney: ALEXANDER MERINO

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference on 07/19/21 at 9:00 am. Comment on 07/19/21 at 9:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney as to. Additional Info: Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: GARY W. SULLIVANNew Attorney: ALEXANDER MERINO Comment Former Attorney: GARY W. SULLIVAN New Attorney: ALEXANDER MERINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral. Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for ROIC California, LLC : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036269-HOJ ROIC California, LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for ROIC California, LLC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: ROIC California, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROIC CALIFORNIA LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sullivan, Gary W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MERINO ALEXANDER M.