This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/15/2020 at 15:17:46 (UTC).

RODRIGO ESPARZA vs. VICTOR AREVALO

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 RODRIGO ESPARZA filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against VICTOR AREVALO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KARESH, Karesh, Jonathan E. and Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3959

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

KARESH

Judges

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESPARZA, RODRIGO OCHOA RUIZ

Respondent

AREVALO, VICTOR

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Re: Temporary Restraining Order.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Temporary Restraining Order ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Temporary Restraining Order 10/07/2020 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: ESPARZA, RODRIGO OCHOA RUIZRespondent: AREVALO, VICTOR

Request for Order - Harassment.

Original Type Request for Order - Harassment ~CIV Minute Order - Request for Order - Harassment 10/07/2020 Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Not Held Parties Present Petitioner: ESPARZA, RODRIGO OCHOA RUIZRespondent: AREVALO, VICTOR

Proof of Service by Personal Service of Restraining Order.

Proof of Service by Personal Service of Restraining Order CH-109 NOTICE OF COURT HEARING CH-110 TEM Comment CH-109 NOTICE OF COURT HEARING, CH-110 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER,CH-100 REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Temporary Restraining Order.

Temporary Restraining Order Granted Comment Granted

Petition for Civil Harassment Restraining Order.

Petition for Civil Harassment Restraining Order

Notice of Court Hearing.

Notice of Court Hearing Signed by: JUDGE KARESHDate Signed: 09/15/2020 Comment Signed by: JUDGE KARESH Date Signed: 09/15/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDismissal - Lack of Prosecution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketInterpreter present. Additional Info: Comment Miss De Avila Spanish, present on behalf of the Petitioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketHearing transferred to Dept:. Additional Info: Comment 23 - Judge Raymond Swope

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Temporary Restraining Order. Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Temporary Restraining Order ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Temporary Restraining Order 10/07/2020 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: ESPARZA, RODRIGO OCHOA RUIZRespondent: AREVALO, VICTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Harassment. Additional Info: Original Type Request for Order - Harassment ~CIV Minute Order - Request for Order - Harassment 10/07/2020 Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Not Held Parties Present Petitioner: ESPARZA, RODRIGO OCHOA RUIZRespondent: AREVALO, VICTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Personal Service of Restraining Order. Additional Info: Proof of Service by Personal Service of Restraining Order CH-109 NOTICE OF COURT HEARING CH-110 TEM Comment CH-109 NOTICE OF COURT HEARING, CH-110 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER,CH-100 REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for ESPARZA, RODRIGO OCHOA RUIZ : By Statute $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for ESPARZA, RODRIGO OCHOA RUIZ : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: ESPARZA, RODRIGO OCHOA RUIZ; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition/Request for civil harassment restraining order File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order. Additional Info: Temporary Restraining Order Granted Comment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Civil Harassment Restraining Order. Additional Info: Petition for Civil Harassment Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing. Additional Info: Notice of Court Hearing Signed by: JUDGE KARESHDate Signed: 09/15/2020 Comment Signed by: JUDGE KARESH Date Signed: 09/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less