This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/16/2020 at 20:08:30 (UTC).

Robert T. Sweeney vs. Rebecca W. Sweeney

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Robert T Sweeney filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Rebecca W Sweeney. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Franchi, Don R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1717

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Franchi, Don R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sweeney, Robert T.

Respondent

Sweeney, Rebecca W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CONE, STEVEN J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Status Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE (in CA) of. Additional Info: Comment Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sweeney, Robert T. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036514-HOJ Sweeney, Robert T. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sweeney, Robert T. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Sweeney, Robert T.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution with Minor Child File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA. Additional Info: Comment Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction & Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less