This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 00:26:54 (UTC).

Robert Harlow, JR vs Covenant Aviation Security, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Robert Harlow, JR filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against Covenant Aviation Security, LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S., Fineman, Nancy L., DAVIS, Weiner, Marie S and Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3986

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

DAVIS

Judges

Weiner, Marie S.

Fineman, Nancy L.

Weiner, Marie S

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harlow, Robert, JR

Defendants

Covenant Aviation Security, LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN, EDWIN

Defendant Attorneys

COOK, COLLIN D.

MOSHER, WILLIAM R.H.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

Class Action Complex Notice.

Class Action Complex Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER REASSIGNING COMPLEX CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT Comment ORDER REASSIGNING COMPLEX CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Order.

Order Type: REASSIGNING COMPLEX CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTI Comment Type: REASSIGNING COMPLEX CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Signed by: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 11/20/2020

Peremptory Challenge against Judicial Officer.

Peremptory Challenge against Judicial Officer received and forwarded to JUDGE DAVIS. Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Comment received and forwarded to JUDGE DAVIS.

Advanced Jury Fee Plaintiff Non-Refundable.

Advanced Jury Fee Plaintiff Non-Refundable PLAINTIFF ROBERT HARLOW JR'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES Comment PLAINTIFF ROBERT HARLOW, JR'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Answer.

Answer BY DEFENDANT COVENANT AVIATION SECURITY LLC'S ANSWER TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES Comment BY DEFENDANT COVENANT AVIATION SECURITY, LLC'S ANSWER TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 Comment CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CMO #2 Comment CMO #2

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/16/2020 Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 01:30 PM Result Held Comment Remote appearance/ Courtcall

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE, SETT Comment NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE, SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND COMPLEX FEE DUE; CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1 served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of ON SUSIE VANG AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE-SUMMONS; CIVIL C Comment ON SUSIE VANG, AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE-SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ;COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment COMPLEX CLASS ACTION SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 03:00 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing ORDER REASSIGNING COMPLEX CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT Comment ORDER REASSIGNING COMPLEX CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder. Additional Info: Order Type: REASSIGNING COMPLEX CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTI Comment Type: REASSIGNING COMPLEX CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES AND SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Signed by: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 11/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge against Judicial Officer. Additional Info: Peremptory Challenge against Judicial Officer received and forwarded to JUDGE DAVIS. Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Comment received and forwarded to JUDGE DAVIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harlow, Robert, JR : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-045949-HOJ Harlow, Robert $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harlow, Robert, JR : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvanced Jury Fee Plaintiff Non-Refundable. Additional Info: Advanced Jury Fee Plaintiff Non-Refundable PLAINTIFF ROBERT HARLOW JR'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES Comment PLAINTIFF ROBERT HARLOW, JR'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order. Additional Info: Case Management Order CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harlow, Robert, JR : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036425-HOJ Harlow, Robert $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Harlow, Robert, JR : Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Harlow, Robert, JR; Total Financial Assessment $1,585.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClass Action Complex Notice. Additional Info: Class Action Complex Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less