This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/06/2022 at 19:27:19 (UTC).

Robert G. Mar vs. Benjamin Charles Mohr, et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 Robert G Mar filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Benjamin Charles Mohr,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0726

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mar, Robert G.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Mohr, Benjamin Charles

DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

Ben Mohr, Inc. A CORPORATION

Wassgren, Paul Randall

SEARS, DEANDRE P.

BEN MOHR, INC.

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Wassgren, Paul Randall

DLA PIPER LLP (USA)

FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

ROES 1 - 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGILLIGAN, DONALD J

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HASSEN, MICHAEL J

SWANSON, EDWARD W.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

SWANSON, EDWARD W.

 

Court Documents

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; ETC... Comment CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; ETC...

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Complaint.

Complaint

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court FEDERAL/DISTRICT COURT 21-CIV-01751 Comment FEDERAL/DISTRICT COURT 21-CIV-01751

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer.

Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; ETC... Comment CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; ETC...

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.; Additional Info: Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court FEDERAL/DISTRICT COURT 21-CIV-01751 Comment FEDERAL/DISTRICT COURT 21-CIV-01751

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wassgren, Paul Randall; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-009854-HOJ Wassgren, Paul Randall $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wassgren, Paul Randall; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Wassgren, Paul Randall; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer.; Additional Info: Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.; Additional Info: Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; ETC... Comment CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT; ETC...

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for MOHR, BENJAMIN CHARLES; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; MOHR, BENJAMIN CHARLES; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mar, Robert G.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-006005-HOJ Mar, Robert G. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mar, Robert G.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Mar, Robert G.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ben Mohr, Inc. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DLA PIPER LLP US is a litigant

Latest cases where FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWANSON, EDWARD W.