This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:15:10 (UTC).

ROBERT FERRO V. MIKE MARTINEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 ROBERT FERRO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIKE MARTINEZ. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Borja, Hugo R and Borja, Hugo R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6646

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Borja, Hugo R

Borja, Hugo R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERT FERRO

Tracy, CA 95376

FERRO, ROBERT

Defendants

MIKE MARTINEZ

SALLY HOPKINS

HOPKINS, SALLY ROSE

MARTINEZ, MIKE

HOPKINS, SALLY

MARTINEZ, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Conversion Hearing.

HEARING NOTICE Judicial Officer Borja Hugo R Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSSR: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF FERRO SERVED BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER AS TO SALLY HOPKINS ON 07/14/12 BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON JOHN DOE. COSTS $42.50. HEARING DATE: 08/08/12.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Comment Fully Satisfied

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PCSSR: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF FERRO SERVED BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER AS TO MIKE MARTINEZ ON 07/14/12 BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON JOHN DOE. COSTS $42.50. HEARING DATE: 08/08/12.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Comment; Comment; (ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY.); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: FERRO ROBERT; Awarded Against: MARTINEZ, MIKE; HOPKINS, SALLY; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 08/22/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF FERRO FOR ROBERT FERRO JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF FERRO AGAINST MIKE MARTINEZ, SALLY HOPKINS DEFENDANT(S) SALLY HOPKINS, MIKE MARTINEZ SHALL PAY PLAINTIFF(S) ROBERT FERRO $4,000.00 PRINCIPAL AND $135.00 COSTS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/22/12 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES 08/22/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Comment Fully Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130522-0763-CC 044/ 6.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121023-0741-CS 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment SCAI: SMALL CLAIMS ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JED: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/22/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment DSPP: DEFENDANT(S) SALLY HOPKINS MIKE MARTINEZ SHALL PAY PLAINTIFF(S) ROBERT FERRO $4,000.00 PRINCIPAL AND $135.00 COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF FERRO AGAINST MIKE MARTINEZ SALLY HOPKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF FERRO FOR ROBERT FERRO

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PCSSR: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF FERRO SERVED BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER AS TO MIKE MARTINEZ ON 07/14/12 BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON JOHN DOE. COSTS $42.50. HEARING DATE: 08/08/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PCSSR: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM OF FERRO SERVED BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER AS TO SALLY HOPKINS ON 07/14/12 BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON JOHN DOE. COSTS $42.50. HEARING DATE: 08/08/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ACRC: AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $4000.00. REASON FOR CLAIM: PERSONAL LOAN 021712

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0866-CK 004/ 50.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Comment PCF2: PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for FERRO, ROBERT : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260866 FERRO, ROBERT $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for FERRO, ROBERT : Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: FERRO, ROBERT; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less