This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 22:27:56 (UTC).

RIGOBERTO CRUZ VS PREMIER MAINTENANCE, INC

Case Summary

On 02/16/2016 RIGOBERTO CRUZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PREMIER MAINTENANCE, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Karesh, Jonathan E, Dylina, Steven L, Dylina, Steven L. and Karesh, Jonathan E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7377

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Karesh, Jonathan E

Dylina, Steven L

Dylina, Steven L.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIGOBERTO CRUZ

CRUZ, RIGOBERTO

Defendant

PREMIER MAINTENANCE, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LADVA, ASHWIN

530 Jackson St., 2Nd Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorney

KLETTER, CARY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Court Hearing.

Notice of Court Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 2/7/18 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 2/7/18

Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR.

*CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: LADVA, ASHWIN

Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR.

*CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: KLETTER, CARY

Statement.

Statement REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Comment REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Court Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Court Trial

Amended Complaint.

Amended Complaint 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AND SECOND CAUSE OF ACT Comment IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AND SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN THE COMPLAINT.

Demurrer and First Appearance Fee to.

Demurrer and First Appearance Fee to TO THE FIRST AND SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN THE COMPLAINT. Comment TO THE FIRST AND SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN THE COMPLAINT.

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee).

Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee) TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ETC. Comment TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC.

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: KLETTER, CARY

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of DEF PREMIER MAINTENANCE INC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE FI Comment DEF PREMIER MAINTENANCE, INC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AND SECOND CAUSES.....

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CRUZ SERVED ON PREMIER MAINTENANCE INC BY SE Comment PSBC: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CRUZ SERVED ON PREMIER MAINTENANCE, INC BY SERVING CONSUELLA NOVA, AUTHORIZED AGENT FOR SERVICE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/29/16

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (OF ENTIRE ACTION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Comment; Comment; (Conditional Settlement Filed).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Court Hearing. Additional Info: Notice of Court Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 2/7/18 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 2/7/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Court Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment COURT TRIAL - TIME ESTIMATE 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case Type: Conditional Comment Type: Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mandatory Settlement Conferences - Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 160216-0988-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for PREMIER MAINTENANCE, INC : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-046574-HOJ RAPID LEGAL $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for PREMIER MAINTENANCE, INC : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for PREMIER MAINTENANCE, INC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial: PREMIER MAINTENANCE, INC; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Financial info for CRUZ, RIGOBERTO : Case Payment Receipt # 201602160988 CRUZ, RIGOBERTO $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Financial info for CRUZ, RIGOBERTO : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Financial: CRUZ, RIGOBERTO; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less