This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/04/2022 at 20:01:37 (UTC).

RICHARD CARON, JR vs. SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 RICHARD CARON, JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SMART FINAL STORES, LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A., MIRAM, BERINI, Weiner, Marie S., Weiner, Marie S, Halperin, Ernst A and Miram, George A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2489

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A.

MIRAM

BERINI

Weiner, Marie S.

Weiner, Marie S

Halperin, Ernst A

Miram, George A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARON, RICHARD, JR

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAVO, JOSEPH K.

Defendant Attorney

ALDRICH, THEODORE F.

 

Court Documents

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement. Requesting associated template form. Comment Requesting associated template form.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer..

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/06/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: BRAVO, JOSEPH K.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/06/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: BRAVO, JOSEPH K.

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 4/6/2021 at 10:00 a.m. - SSF Comment Case Management Conference - 4/6/2021 at 10:00 a.m. - SSF

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer..

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/06/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: BRAVO, JOSEPH K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 4/6/2021 at 10:00 a.m. - SSF Comment Case Management Conference - 4/6/2021 at 10:00 a.m. - SSF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Meet and confer..; Additional Info: CMC - At issue - Meet and confer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received ADDITIONAL FEE WAIVER Comment ADDITIONAL FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand For Jury Trial.; Additional Info: Demand For Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees.; Additional Info: Comment Order - Request to Waive Additional Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver Granted.; Additional Info: Comment Signed by ANTHONY BERINI on 06/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees.; Additional Info: Comment Request to Waive Additional Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.; Additional Info: Comment Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAVO, JOSEPH K.