This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:42:35 (UTC).

RE: CRYSTAL MARIE KIRKBRIDE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 RE CRYSTAL MARIE KIRKBRIDE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2810

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE

KALANI, CRYSTAL MARIE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Change of Name.

Order to Show Cause Change of Name

Notice of Change of Name Hearing.

Notice of Change of Name Hearing

Decree Changing Name and/or Gender.

Decree Changing Name and/or Gender Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 07/19/18 New Name: CRYSTAL Comment Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 07/19/18 New Name: CRYSTAL MARIE KALANI

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Name Change.

Petition for Name Change

Proposed Decree Received.

Proposed Decree Received

Fee Waiver Granted.

Fee Waiver Granted Signed by JUDGE AYOOB on Comment Signed by JUDGE AYOOB on

Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name.

~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 07/19/2018 Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE

Proof of Publication of.

Proof of Publication of SAN MATEO COUNTY TIMES Comment SAN MATEO COUNTY TIMES

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Etezadi Susan I.; Judgment Type; Court Finding; Party; Name: KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE; Comment: NEW NAME: CRYSTAL MARIE KALANI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Decree Changing Name and/or Gender. Additional Info: Decree Changing Name and/or Gender Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 07/19/18 New Name: CRYSTAL Comment Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 07/19/18 New Name: CRYSTAL MARIE KALANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 07/19/2018 Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication of. Additional Info: Proof of Publication of SAN MATEO COUNTY TIMES Comment SAN MATEO COUNTY TIMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Fee Waiver Granted. Additional Info: Fee Waiver Granted Signed by JUDGE AYOOB on 06/08/2018 Comment Signed by JUDGE AYOOB on 06/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Name Hearing. Additional Info: Notice of Change of Name Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause Change of Name. Additional Info: Order to Show Cause Change of Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Order sent for signature to Department. Additional Info: Comment 27; RE: FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Order sent for signature to Department. Additional Info: Comment 18 RE: NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition for Name Change File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Name Change. Additional Info: Petition for Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Financial info for KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-048193-HOJ KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Financial info for KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE : Fee Waiver $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Financial info for KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE : Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Financial info for KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE : Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Financial info for KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE : Transaction Assessment $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: KIRKBRIDE, CRYSTAL MARIE; Total Financial Assessment $511.50; Total Payments and Credits $511.50

    Read MoreRead Less