This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 11:12:25 (UTC).

RADIN CO. vs. GLORIA TSUYAJI YAMAUCHI, et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 RADIN CO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLORIA TSUYAJI YAMAUCHI. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Scott, Joseph C., Buchwald, Gerald J., DuBois, Richard H., Greenberg, Susan, Karesh, Jonathan E. and Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0619

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Scott, Joseph C.

Buchwald, Gerald J.

DuBois, Richard H.

Greenberg, Susan

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RADIN CO.

Defendants

DOES 1-20

YAMAUCHI, GLORIA TSUYAJI

NEWTON, BRIAN GRAHAM

NEWTON, THOMAS GAVIN

CAMPBELL, PATRICIA

DOES 2-20, inclusive

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAH, SONIA S

Defendant Attorneys

POLLARD, BRYAN, ESQ

HARSHMAN, DANIEL D., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Declaration.

Declaration OF RUBEN CASTELLON Comment OF RUBEN CASTELLON

Declaration.

Declaration OF GLORIA TSUYAKO YAMAUCHI Comment OF GLORIA TSUYAKO YAMAUCHI

Motion (Unlimited Case First Appearance Fee).

Motion (Unlimited Case First Appearance Fee) TO QUASH SERVICE OF SPECIALLY APPEARING ETC. Comment TO QUASH SERVICE OF SPECIALLY APPEARING, ETC.

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Declaration of Due Diligence.

Declaration of Due Diligence

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) ANSWER Comment ANSWER

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT QUESTIONABLE SERVICE - SUB SERVE WITHO Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, QUESTIONABLE SERVICE - SUB SERVE WITHOUT DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

Declaration of Non-Service.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration.

Declaration OF KELLIE EMMONS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS. Comment OF KELLIE EMMONS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS.

Declaration.

Declaration OF THOMAS SCOTT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS. Comment OF THOMAS SCOTT IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS.

Declaration.

Declaration OF EDGAR MENDEZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCE Comment OF EDGAR MENDEZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE Comment OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Notice of CMC set for 7/21/17 Comment Notice of CMC set for 7/21/17

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT ETC. SUBSERVED TO JANE DOE, DAUGHTER Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT, ETC. SUBSERVED TO JANE DOE, DAUGHTER

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received QUASHING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ETC. Comment QUASHING SERVICE OF SUMMONS, ETC.

Declaration.

Declaration OF LAUREN YAMAUCHI Comment OF LAUREN YAMAUCHI

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Stay/Removal; Comment; Comment; (CASE STAYED PER NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 9-21-17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 4 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF STAY Comment NOTICE OF STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Stay of Party/Parties. Additional Info: Notice of Stay of Party/Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings. Additional Info: Notice of Stay of Proceedings As Follows: With regard to all parties Reason: Automatic stay caused b Comment As Follows: With regard to all parties Reason: Automatic stay caused by a filing in another court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Trial Brief. Additional Info: Trial Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Witness List. Additional Info: Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit List. Additional Info: Exhibit List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/06/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:30 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • Financial info for YAMAUCHI, GLORIA TSUYAJI : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Financial info for YAMAUCHI, GLORIA TSUYAJI : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Financial: YAMAUCHI, GLORIA TSUYAJI; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Financial info for RADIN CO. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-052945-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS, INC $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Financial info for RADIN CO. : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Financial info for RADIN CO. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-040684-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Financial info for RADIN CO. : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Financial info for RADIN CO. : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-010660-HOJ RADIN CO. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Financial info for RADIN CO. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Financial: RADIN CO.; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shah, Sonia Sanjit