Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:44:43 (UTC).

RACQUEL LABUTAY vs. ANN MARIE MOLOSKY PETTIGREW, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 RACQUEL LABUTAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANN MARIE MOLOSKY PETTIGREW. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Castillo, Monica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0726

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Castillo, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LABUTAY, RACQUEL

Defendants

FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

PETTIGREW, ANN MARIE MOLOSKY

 

Court Documents

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem.

Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER. Person served: RUDY EUSEBIO Co Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: RUDY EUSEBIO Costs: 250.00 Hearing Date:

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment.

Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

Small Claims Hearing.

~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 08/13/2018 Judicial Officer Castillo Monica Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: LABUTAY, RACQUELDefendant: PETTIGREW, ANN MARIE MOLOSKYDefendant: FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Comment Fully Satisfied

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.Person served: SARAH SANDERS-C Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: SARAH SANDERS-CO-OCCUPANT Costs: 250.00 Hearing Date:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Castillo Monica; Judgment Type; Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Comment; Comment; (PER ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 09/21/18); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: LABUTAY, RACQUEL; Awarded Against: PETTIGREW, ANN MARIE MOLOSKY; FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.; Amount; Damages: $4,695.50; Costs: $304.50; Total: $5000.00; Comment: JUDGMENT ORDERED FOR THE PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS.; Party; Names: LABUTAY, RACQUEL; PETTIGREW, ANN MARIE MOLOSKY; FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Comment Fully Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Comment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Matter Taken Under Submission. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Castillo Monica Comment Matter under submission: Small Claims Judicial officer: Monica Castillo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem. Additional Info: Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Decision Sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Hearing. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 08/13/2018 Judicial Officer Castillo Monica Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: LABUTAY, RACQUELDefendant: PETTIGREW, ANN MARIE MOLOSKYDefendant: FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.Person served: SARAH SANDERS-C Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: SARAH SANDERS-CO-OCCUPANT Costs: 250.00 Hearing Date: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER.Person served: RUDY EUSEBIOCo Comment PROCESS SERVER. Person served: RUDY EUSEBIO Costs: 250.00 Hearing Date: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for LABUTAY, RACQUEL : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2018-037345-HOJ LABUTAY, RACQUEL $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for LABUTAY, RACQUEL : Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: LABUTAY, RACQUEL; Total Financial Assessment $50.00; Total Payments and Credits $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less