This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 05:10:44 (UTC).

RACHEL CLAYDEN AND GRAHAM CLAYDEN

Case Summary

On 01/08/2015 RACHEL CLAYDEN AND GRAHAM CLAYDEN was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREENBERG, Reyna, Renee C, Warner, Loreen, Greenberg, Susan, Dabel, Sean P, SUSAN GREENBERG and DUBOIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7713

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

GREENBERG

Reyna, Renee C

Warner, Loreen

Greenberg, Susan

Dabel, Sean P

SUSAN GREENBERG

DUBOIS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLAYDEN, RACHEL

Respondent

CLAYDEN, GRAHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LONG, CRYSTAL M

LEFF, STEVEN A.

Respondent Attorney

RIGONAN, BRIAN P.

 

Court Documents

Court Trial.

CIV Minutes Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment Dept: 3 TRIAL: FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE 03:00 HOURS Parties Present Petitioner: CLAYDEN, RACHELAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondent: CLAYDEN, GRAHAMAttorney: RIGONAN, BRIAN P.

Court Trial - Short Cause.

FAM Minutes Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Distribution of proceed of the real property Parties Present Petitioner: CLAYDEN, RACHELAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondent: CLAYDEN, GRAHAMAttorney: RIGONAN, BRIAN P.

Status Conference.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held

Status Conference.

FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 01:30 PM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondentAttorney: RIGONAN, BRIAN P.

Further Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondent: CLAYDEN, GRAHAM

Request for Order RE: Modification.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment OF CHILD SUPPORT, VISITATION Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL M

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: CLAYDEN, RACHELAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondent: CLAYDEN, GRAHAM

Request for Order RE: Child Support.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: CLAYDEN, RACHELAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondent: CLAYDEN, GRAHAM

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held -

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

*FAM Minute Order Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondentAttorney: Smith, Blair Rhodes

Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Status Conference 09/22/2017 Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Continued Party's motion Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondentAttorney: Smith, Blair Rhodes

Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Status Conference 11/17/2017 Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Not Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondentAttorney: Smith, Blair Rhodes

Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Status Conference 03/09/2018 Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held - Parties Present Petitioner: CLAYDEN, RACHELAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondent: CLAYDEN, GRAHAMAttorney: Smith, Blair Rhodes

Family Law Status Conference.

*FAM Minute Order - Family Law Status Conference 05/11/2018 Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: LONG, CRYSTAL MRespondentAttorney: Smith, Blair Rhodes

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketRuling on Submitted Matter.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Comment ***2pm***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMail returned undelivered.; Additional Info: Comment Document: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Reason: RETURN TO SENDER/NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED/UNABLE TO FORWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEvidentiary Hearing.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Comment ***2PM****division of assests/dissolution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Comment Petitioner's Income and Expense Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference/Trial Setting Orders.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Mandatory Settlement Conference Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: CLAYDEN, RACHELAttorney: LEFF, STEVEN A.Respondent: CLAYDEN, GRAHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
354 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150108-0306-CK 210/ 30.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketCourt reporter fees.; Additional Info: Comment CRFEE1: COURT REPORTER FEE OF $30.00 PAID BY RACHEL CLAYDEN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment MFL: MOTION RE: CHILD SUPPORT FILED BY RACHEL CLAYDEN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA.; Additional Info: Comment DUCCJ: DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration.; Additional Info: Comment IE: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY RACHEL CLAYDEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY RACHEL CLAYDEN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 3 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150108-0264-CK 204/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIGONAN, BRIAN P.