This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 22:08:06 (UTC).

QUISENBERRY VS. ALERE MEDICAL

Case Summary

On 09/19/2008 QUISENBERRY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ALERE MEDICAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, Foiles, Robert D, Dylina, Steven L, Dylina, Steven L. and Weiner, Marie S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6767

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2008

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Foiles, Robert D

Dylina, Steven L

Dylina, Steven L.

Weiner, Marie S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE

Defendants

ROGGENSACK, JEFF

ALERE MEDICAL, INC A WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARY OF INVERNESS MEDICAL INNOVATIONS, INC

HETZ, DAVID

TA X, L.P.

TANK, PEI

TEWHILL, JANET

SMITH, ROBB

TA ASSOCIATES, INC

TADLER, RICHARD D

MOORE, M.D., TIMOTHY J

NORMAN, M.D., GORDON K

TILLOTSON, M.D., JOHN

KRACHUN, WAYNE

LANE, CURTIS

COVINGTON ASSOCIATES LLC

CHAMBERS, JEFFREY T

LLOYD, L. JACK

AGORA PARENT, INC.

GOSSETT, KENT

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEVIN, MATTHEW J

Defendant Attorneys

WHITE, BRANDON F

SWAIN, PHILIIP C.

WINAWER, LLOYD

POSS, STEPHEN D

FOLEY HOAG LLP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DEFTS NTC OF DEMETC SERVED ON ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY FIL Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DEFTS NTC OF DEM,ETC SERVED ON ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY FILED. DATE OF MAILING 06/26/09.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED. Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Notice of Appearance pursuant to CCP 1014 filed.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PURSUANT TO CCP 1014 FILED AS TO TA ASSOCIATES INC, JEFFREY T CHAMBERS REPRES Comment NOA1: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PURSUANT TO CCP 1014 FILED AS TO TA ASSOCIATES, INC, JEFFREY T CHAMBERS REPRESENTED BY LLOYD WINAWER.

Conversion Action.

EXHIBIT A RECEIVED. Comment COMM: EXHIBIT A RECEIVED.

Document.

APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS REPLY TO PLTF''S OP FILED. APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS REPLY TO PLTF''S OP, FILED. Comment FILED: APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS REPLY TO PLTF''S OP, FILED.

Conversion Action.

(S) DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY FILED BY ALERE MEDICA Comment DEM: (S) DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY FILED BY ALERE MEDICAL INC, RONALD D GERATY, M.D., TIMOTHY J MOORE, M.D., JANET TEWHILL, GORDON K NORMAN, M.D., WAYNE KRACHUN, JEFF ROGGENSACK, PEI TANK REPRESENTED BY BRA

Document.

DEFENDANTS JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FILED. Comment FILED: DEFENDANTS JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT, FILED.

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COVINGTON ASSOC REPLY TO PLTF''S OPPOSITION TO DEMU SERVED ON ESTATE OF MELISSA Comment POS: PROOF OF SERVICE OF COVINGTON ASSOC REPLY TO PLTF''S OPPOSITION TO DEMU SERVED ON ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY BY OVERNIGHT COURIER WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 09/08/09.

Conversion Action.

REPLY TO PLTF''S OPPOSITION TO ITS DEMURRER FILED BY COVINGTON ASSOCIATES LLC Comment REP: REPLY TO PLTF''S OPPOSITION TO ITS DEMURRER FILED BY COVINGTON ASSOCIATES LLC

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2011
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF DECLAR. OF WAYNE KRACHUN & ORDER ON MOTIN TO EXCLUDE SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 08/09/11 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • Order. Additional Info: Comment O: ORDER ON MOTION TO EXCLUDE SIGNED BY JUDGE WEINER ON 08/09/11, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • Document. Additional Info: Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF WAYNE KRACHUN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: LETTER RECD FROM DEFT WAYNE KRACHUN AND LOCATED TO DEPT 2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment SUP: SUPPLEMENTAL DECL OF MATTHEW J.ZEVIN IN SUP OF PLTFS' MOT TO EXCLUDE WAYNE FRACHUN FROM SETTLMNT CLS FILED BY ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • Document. Additional Info: Comment FILED: ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY G.OCHOA ON 07/01/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: COUNSEL AND MR. KRACHUN WAIVE FORMAL NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING THE DEADLINES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: SENT TO BOTH PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: AFTER RECEIVING THE REPLY FROM MR. ZEVIN. THE ORIGINAL IS TO BE SENT TO THE COURT WITH A COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
765 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2011
  • Financial info for ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE : Case Payment Receipt # 201104040169 ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Financial info for ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE : Case Payment Receipt # 201008310075 ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Financial info for ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE : Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • Financial info for ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE : Case Payment Receipt # 200811240067 ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • Financial info for ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • Financial info for ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE : Case Payment Receipt # 200811240066 ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE $550.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • Financial info for ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE : Transaction Assessment $550.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Financial info for ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE : Case Payment Receipt # 200809240083 ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Financial info for ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE : Transaction Assessment $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • Financial: ESTATE OF MELISSA PRINCE QUISENBERRY & JAMES P PRINCE; Total Financial Assessment $1,010.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,010.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TA ASSOCIATES MANAGEMENT, LP is a litigant