This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 18:17:09 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE CHOICE INSURANCE VS KULDEEP SINGH

Case Summary

On 01/17/2013 PROGRESSIVE CHOICE INSURANCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KULDEEP SINGH. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9204

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE CHOICEINSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

KULDEEP SINGH

SINGH, KULDEEP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS, MARK R.

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

FILING (2) Comment DL30: CERTIFICATE OF FACTS WITH CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT ISSUED.

Judgment by Court.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCT: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED ON 05/05/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DLT: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY PROGRESSIVE CHOICEINSURANCE COMPANY

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF PROGRESSIVE CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment RCJ: REQUEST FOR COURT/CLERK JUDGMENT AS TO KULDEEP SINGH FILED BY PROGRESSIVE CHOICEINSURANCE COMPANY.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PROGRESSIVE CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO KULDEEP SINGH BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, OCCUPANT. MAILING DATE OF 01/27/13.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: PROGRESSIVE CHOICEINSURANCE COMPANY; Awarded Against: SINGH KULDEEP; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 05/05/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PROGRESSIVE CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY FOR PROGRESSIVE CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PROGRESSIVE CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY AGAINST KULDEEP SINGH PRINCIPAL IS $5,185.88. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $284.00. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,469.88.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 141217-0031-CK 141/ 25.00 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: FILING (2) Comment DL30: CERTIFICATE OF FACTS WITH CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140917-0156-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $5469.88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $284.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $5185.88.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PROGRESSIVE CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO KULDEEP SINGH BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE, OCCUPANT. MAILING DATE OF 01/27/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130117-0493-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • Financial info for PROGRESSIVE CHOICEINSURANCE COMPANY : Case Payment Receipt # 201301170493 PROGRESSIVE CHOICEINSURANCE COMPANY $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • Financial info for PROGRESSIVE CHOICEINSURANCE COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • Financial: PROGRESSIVE CHOICEINSURANCE COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

SHORT TITLE:

, , 1003-011532400 2013011521:21 Lea & Nivinskus (714 sfrbk 'PHW% Progressive vs Kuldeep Singh

10. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each: (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached.)

a. Motor Vehicle b. General Negligence C. Intentional Tort - d. [__] Products Liability e. Premises Liability f. [ XJother (specity):

SEE PAGE 5 ATTACHMENT

11. Plaintiff has suffered a.[ ] wage loss b. IXI loss of use of property c.[ ] hospital and medical expenses d. ] general damage e. [ X] properly damage f. [_Tioss of earning capacity g. [_lother damage (specify):

12._1The damages claimed for wrongful death and the relationship of plaintiff to the deceased are a. [__liisted in the Complaint-Attachment 12. b. [:l as follows:

13. Relief sought in this complaint is within the jurisdiction of this court.

14. PLAINTIFF PRAYS for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. (1) compensatory damages (2) [ ] punilive damages b. The amount of damages is (you must check (1) in cases for personal injury or wrongful death): (1) [ ] according to proof. . (2) EX:I in the amount of” $5,185.88 plus pre-judgment interest at the rate of 10% per annum, pursvant to CCP § 3291.

15. [ XIThe following paragraphs of this complaint are alleged on information and belief (specify paragraph numbers): All

Date: January 11, 2013

.., MarkR. Nivinskus 6 of 10

PLD-PI-001 [Rev January 1, 2007} Page three of three

PLD-PI-001 [Rev January 1, 2007} Page three of three SHORT TITLE: CASE .«UMBER: Progressive vs Kuldeep Singh 1003-011532400 2013011521:21 Lea & Nivinskus (714)533-8828 Page 7 of 10

SHORT TITLE: CASE .«UMBER: Progressive vs Kuldeep Singh 1003-011532400 2013011521:21 Lea & Nivinskus (714)533-8828 Page 7 of 10

Fis,_ CAUSE OF ACTION-Motor Vehicle

ATTACHMENT TO [X]Complaint [__] Cross-Complaint (use a separate cause of action form for each cause of action.) Plaintiff (name): PROGRESSIVE CHOICE INSURANCE COMPANY

MV-1. Plaintiff alleges the acts of defendants were negligent; the acts were the legal (proximate) cause of injuries and damages to plaintiff; the acts occurred on (name): July 31, 2012 at (place). Willow Rd & Bayshore Dr, Menlo Park, CA 94025

MV-2. DEFENDANTS . a. The defendants who operate a motor vehicle are (names): Kuldeep Singh

[X1boes ONE to TWENTY

b. [ XJ The defendants who employed the persons who operated a motor vehicle in the course of their employment are (names):

Does _ONE_to _TWENTY C. The defendant who owned the motor vehicle which was operated with their permission are (names):

[XJDoes _ONE_to _TWENTY d. [ Xthe defendants who entrusted the motor vehicle are (names):

[X]Does ONE to TWENTY

e. [ XJThe defendants who were the agents and employees of the other defendants and acted within the scope of the agency were (names):

Does _ONE to TWENTY t. (X0 The defendants who are liable to plaintifts for other reasons for the liability are [:llisted in Attachment MV-2f as follows: