This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 18:14:03 (UTC).

PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation vs. PETER G. DELLANINI, et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC , a California corporation filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against PETER G DELLANINI. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Cretan, Clifford V, Cretan, Clifford V., Grandsaert, John L., Fineman, Nancy L. and Davis, III, Leland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3376

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Cretan, Clifford V

Cretan, Clifford V.

Grandsaert, John L.

Fineman, Nancy L.

Davis, III, Leland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DELLANINI, PETER G.

TIFFANY'S CLEANING SERVICES, INC., a California corporation

DOES 1-5

TRUSTEE OF THE PETER G. DELLANINI AND REBECCA R. DELLANINI 2014 TRUST

Cross Defendants

NAVE, ROBB

GARBANSO LLC

SQUERI, ROBERT J.

DELLANINI, GREGORY D.

PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODIN, ROBERT A.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

EHRLICH, JOSEPH

Cross Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON, KEITH E.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Notice of Court Hearing.

Notice of Court Hearing Notice of CMC set for 7/18/18 Comment Notice of CMC set for 7/18/18

Notice.

Notice PURSUANT TO RULE OF COURT 3.1385 Comment PURSUANT TO RULE OF COURT 3.1385

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE" STAY OF ACTION Signed by: JUDGE CRETAN Comment Type: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE" STAY OF ACTION Signed by: JUDGE CRETAN Date Signed: 12/5/17

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Court Hearing.

Notice of Court Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing: 6/26/18 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing: 6/26/18

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case Type: Conditional Comment Type: Conditional

Case Management Conference.

*CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, PETER DELLANINI-AGENT FOR SERVICE Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, PETER DELLANINI-AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint.

Complaint

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Comment; Comment; (NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION.).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Cretan Clifford V.; Judgment Type; Stay/Removal; Comment; Comment; (ACTION IS STAYED PENDING COMPLETION OF THE PARTIES' MEDIATION WITH JAMS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Master Calendar - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 10 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order. Additional Info: Order Type: RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO INSPECTION DEMANDS Sig Comment Type: RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO INSPECTION DEMANDS Signed by: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 7/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT PETER DELLANINI'S FURTHER RESPONS Comment RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT PETER DELLANINI'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO INSPECTION DEMANDS SET NO 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Tentative ruling adopted and becomes order:. Additional Info: Comment PLAINTIFF/CROSS DEFENDANT PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC.'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT PETER G. DELLANINI TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S INSPECTION DEMANDS, SET NO. 2. Plaintiff PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES, INC.'s Motion to Compel Further is GRANTED. Defendant PETER G. DELLANINI is ordered to serve full and complete, verified responses to Request for Production of Documents (Set Two), Request Nos. 68, 69, 70, 73 and 75 no later than July 19, 2019. If the tentative ruling is uncontested, it shall become the order of the Court. Thereafter, counsel for Plaintiff shall prepare a written order consistent with the Court's ruling for the Court's signature, pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1312, and provide written notice of the ruling to all parties who have appeared in the action, as required by law and the California Rules of Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel Further. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel Further 07/11/2019 Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment PLAINTIFF/ CROSS DEFENDANT PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO INSPECTION DEMANDS SET NO 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of. Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPON Comment PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO INSPECTION DEMANDS SET NO. 2 served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • Financial info for PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Financial info for PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-016499-HOJ NATIONWIDE $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Financial info for PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Financial info for PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-081847-HOJ NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Financial info for PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Financial info for PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-078652-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Financial info for PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Financial info for PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-052586-HOJ PREFERRED LEGAL SERVICES INC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Financial info for PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Financial: PREFERRED BUILDING SERVICES INC., a California corporation; Total Financial Assessment $785.00; Total Payments and Credits $785.00

    Read MoreRead Less