This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 01:35:29 (UTC).

PRASHANTH GANAPATHY vs. JENNIFER GRIEVES, et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2017 PRASHANTH GANAPATHY filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against JENNIFER GRIEVES. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Ayoob, Donald J. and Ayoob, Donald J. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5625

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Ayoob, Donald J.

Ayoob, Donald J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GANAPATHY, PRASHANTH

Defendants

ABC PARTNERSHIP 1-10

DEF LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANIES 1-10

XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10

GRIEVES, JENNIFER

JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENFELD, JEFFREY M

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Comment Without Prejudice

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET S Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON JANE DOE RESIDENCE

Default Judgment by Court.

Default Judgment by Court

Declaration.

Declaration IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.1800) Comment IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.1800)

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration.

Declaration OF KARL S. KRONENBERGER IN SUPPOR OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDMENT (CRC 3. Comment OF KARL S. KRONENBERGER IN SUPPOR OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDMENT (CRC 3.1800)

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Default Judgment by Court.

Default Judgment by Court

Declaration.

Declaration CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ON MARCH 162018 (FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMEN Comment CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ON MARCH 16,2018 (FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF PRASHANTH GANAPATHY IN SUP OF PLTFS' APP FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ETC (SEE DO FOR DETAILS)

Declaration.

Declaration OF KARL S. KRONENBERGER IN SUPPOR OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDMENT (CRC 3. Comment OF KARL S. KRONENBERGER IN SUPPOR OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDMENT (CRC 3.1800)

Declaration.

Declaration OF DEFENDANT JENNIFER GRIEVES Comment OF DEFENDANT JENNIFER GRIEVES

Declaration.

Declaration IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.1800) Comment IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.1800)

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Comment Without Prejudice

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order OF DEFAULT Comment OF DEFAULT

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; GANAPATHY, PRASHANTH; GRIEVES, JENNIFER; JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10; ABC PARTNERSHIP 1-10; XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10; DEF LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANIES 1-10; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To; GANAPATHY, PRASHANTH; Awarded Against; GRIEVES, JENNIFER; Comment: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT (1) AS STATED IN DEFENDANT'S DECLARATION, WHICH IS ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT A, AND INCORPORATED BY REFERENCE AS IF FULLY SET FORTH HEREIN, DEFENDANT JENNIFER GRIEVES ADMITS TO AUTHORING CONTENT THAT WAS POSTED AT THE URLs LISTED IN THE COMPLAINT (THE "FALSE STATEMENTS"), WHICH INCLUDES ALL OF THE FOLLOWING CONTENT: a. https://liarscheatersus.com/prshanth-ganapathy-washington-ghosting-and-incomplete-disclose. b. http://cheaterreport.com/prashanth-ganapathy-of-washington-deceptive-and-incomplete-disclosure; c. http//cheatereports.com/prashanth-gaanapathy-deceptive-dating; d. http://www.reportmyex.com/prashanth-ganapathy-seattle-wash-usa; e. http://cheaterland.com/prashanth-ganapathy-washington-ghosting-and-lying..html; f. https//www.beware.org/cheater/cautious-indian-man-lives-seattle-crazy/; g. https//encyclopediadramatica.is/cheating-drama/prshanth-ganapathy-seattle-wash-usa/; h.l http://reportbadbiz.com/tag/prashanth-ganapathy-seattle-washington. 2. AS OF February 15, 2018, THE FOLLOWING ADDITIONAL ONLINE CONTENT EXISTS ABOUT PLAINTIFF, WHICH CONTENT IS COPIED AND REPUBLISHED VERBATIM FROM THE URLs LISTED ABOVE, AND WHICH CONTENT IS FALSE, DEFAMATORY, AND PRESENTS PLAINTIFF IN A FALSE LIGH: a. http://www.theygotbusted.com/prashanth-ganapathy-seattle-wash-usa/ b. http://cheatingcomplaints.com/prashanth-ganapathy-seattle-wash-usa/ c. http://frauds.website/search?q=[rasjamtj+Ganapahy%2C+Seattle%2c+Washington&searlch-type=tags; and d. http://www.stinkypedia.com/prashanth-ganapathy-seattle-wash-usa/; 3. AS STATED IN DEFENDANT'S DECLARATION, DEFENDANT DESIRES ALL OF THE CONTENT IN ALL OF THE ABOVE-REFERENCED URLs TO BE REMOVED; 4. BY VIRTUE OF DEFAULT ENTRY, AND DEFENDANT'S ADMISSIONS, AND BECAUSE THE HARM ALLEGED IS ONGOING, DEFENDANT IS ENJOINED FROM RE-PUBLISHING ANY OF THE FALSE STATEMENTS; 5. DEFENDANT AND DEFENDANT'S AGENTS, AFFILIATES, OR OTHER PERSONS, OR ENTITIES ASSISTING OR ENABLING DEFENDANT'S PUBLICATION OF THE BELOW AND ABOVE-REFERENCED FALSE STATEMENTS (COLLECTIVELY "DEFENDANTS AGENTS") SHALL IMMEDIATELY REMOVE FROM ALL WEBSITES, SEARCH ENGINES, FORUMS, BLOGS, LISTS, SOCIAL MEDIA SITES, AND OTHER FORUMS OF MASS COMMUNICATION (COLLECTIVELY "FORUMS") ALL OF THE FALSE STATEMENTS, INCLUDING ANY VARIATIONS THEREOF, AS WELL AS ANY SEARCH TERMS AND/OR URLs THAT ARE RELATED, DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, OR WOULD BE REASONABLY CALCULATED TO LEAD TO THE FALSE STATEMENTS CONTAINED WITHIN OR ANY OF THE URL's LISTED HEREIN; 6. BY VIRTUE OF BEING SERVED THE COMPLAINT AND THE DEFAULT ENTRY MADE AGAINST HER, DEFENDANT ADMITS THE ALLEGATIONS IN THE COMPLAINT, THAT HER STATEMENTS MADE IN THE URLs ARE NEITHER ACCURATE NOR SUBSTANTIALLY TRUE BECAUSE THEY DO NOT DESCRIBE THE PARTIES' INTERACTION WITH COMPLETE ACCURACY, AND PLACE PLAINTIFF IN A A FALSE LIGHT. SPECIFICALLY, THE FOLLOWING STATEMENTS ARE FALSE AND DEFAMATORY, SUBSTANTIALLY UNTRUE, OR OTHERWISE PLACE PLAINTIFF IN A FALSE LIGHT. PLAINTIFF "DOES NOT HONOR OR RESPECT US AS WOMEN", PRESSURED AND PRESSURED TO HAVE SEX, HE ATTEMPTED TO SEDUCE ME INTO SEX WITH HIS LIES AND DECEPTIVE STORIES", AND HE DENIED HIS "DATE THE RIGHT TO INFORMED CONSENT", AMONG OTHER STATEMENTS; (PLEASE READ DOCUMENT FOR NUMBER 7 THROUGH 12 FOR CONTINUATION OF JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment by Court.; Additional Info: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: Declaration CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ON MARCH 162018 (FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMEN Comment CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ON MARCH 16,2018 (FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF PRASHANTH GANAPATHY IN SUP OF PLTFS' APP FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ETC (SEE DO FOR DETAILS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: Declaration OF KARL S. KRONENBERGER IN SUPPOR OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDMENT (CRC 3. Comment OF KARL S. KRONENBERGER IN SUPPOR OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDMENT (CRC 3.1800)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: Declaration OF DEFENDANT JENNIFER GRIEVES Comment OF DEFENDANT JENNIFER GRIEVES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: Declaration IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.1800) Comment IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.1800)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) Comment Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default.; Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET S Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON JANE DOE RESIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for GANAPATHY, PRASHANTH; Case Payment Receipt # 2017-083527-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for GANAPATHY, PRASHANTH; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • FinancialFinancial; GANAPATHY, PRASHANTH; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENFELD JEFFREY MICHAEL