This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:16:51 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY VS ROLANDO P BELEN III

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROLANDO P BELEN III. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4875

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendants

ROLANDO P BELEN III

BELEN, ROLANDO P, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUNDQUIST, ANDREW P

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (33) Comment DLT: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (4) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $54.36, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Declaration.

DECLARATION (34) Comment D1033: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 1033(B) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (16) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $312.57, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00 ---

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC AS TO ROLANDO P BELEN III.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT (15) Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 07/21/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Conversion Action.

WRIT (10) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXEUCITON FOR MONEY JUDGMENT FROM PLACER COUNTY RETURNED U SATISFIED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC SERVED ON ROLANDO P BELEN III WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/12/12.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO (10) Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC IN SUPPORTING A CLERK JUDGMENT

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT (12) Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC FILED

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (31) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Conversion Action.

REQUEST (30) Comment RCJ: REQUEST FOR COURT/CLERK JUDGMENT AS TO ROLANDO P BELEN III FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC; Awarded Against: BELEN, ROLANDO P, III; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 07/21/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ROLANDO P BELEN III PRINCIPAL IS $5,531.11. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $0.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,531.11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT (10) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXEUCITON FOR MONEY JUDGMENT FROM PLACER COUNTY RETURNED U SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JST: JUDGMENT ENTERED 07/21/14 -- SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: ACKNOWLEDGMENT (12) Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150317-0575-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO PLACER COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $5898.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS (16) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $312.57, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140917-0141-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $5610.47

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120629-0313-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206290313 PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less