This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:16:59 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY VS PHILBERT G WONG

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PHILBERT G WONG. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4878

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendants

PHILBERT G WONG

WONG, PHILBERT G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUNDQUIST, ANDREW P

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Document.

FILING (4) Comment FILED: AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

Conversion Action.

REQUEST Comment DNE: DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED. REASON: ENTIRE CASE WAS PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 09/12/12.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC SERVED ON PHILBERT G WONG WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/13/12.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Document.

FILING (3) Comment FILED: AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE: AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: WONG PHILBERT G; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: REQUEST Comment DNE: DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED. REASON: ENTIRE CASE WAS PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 09/12/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (4) Comment FILED: AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (3) Comment FILED: AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (2) Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC SERVED ON PHILBERT G WONG WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/13/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE: AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120629-0305-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206290305 PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less