This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:17:59 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY VS BEATRIZ A LOCKETT

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BEATRIZ A LOCKETT. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4868

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES

Defendants

BEATRIZ A LOCKETT

LOCKETT, BEATRIZ A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUNDQUIST, ANDREW P

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: SECOND DECLARATION (C.C.P.585(A)) FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES

Affidavit.

AFFIDAVIT Comment AFFI: AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY FILED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES SERVED ON BEATRIZ A LOCKETT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/08/12.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT (8) Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES FILED

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES IN SUPPORTING A CLERK JUDGMENT

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $16.72, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES AS TO BEATRIZ A LOCKETT.

Judgment by Court.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCT: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY COURT ENTERED ON 12/11/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Writ of Execution Return.

Writ of Execution Return Comment County: CONTRA COSTA Status: Wholly Satisfied Issued on: 02/18/14 Amount: 1445.57

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES; Awarded Against: LOCKETT BEATRIZ A; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 12/11/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES AGAINST BEATRIZ A LOCKETT PRINCIPAL IS $1,163.35. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $240.50. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,403.85.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Return. Additional Info: Writ of Execution Return Comment County: CONTRA COSTA Status: Wholly Satisfied Issued on: 02/18/14 Amount: 1445.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JST: JUDGMENT ENTERED 12/11/13 -- SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: ACKNOWLEDGMENT (8) Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140218-0350-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $1445.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $16.72, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $1403.85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit. Additional Info: AFFIDAVIT Comment AFFI: AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120626-0655-CK 131/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260655 PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less