This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 18:03:40 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,LLC V LITO VITUG

Case Summary

On 01/16/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LITO VITUG. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9002

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC

Defendants

LLITO VITUG

VITUG, LLITO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERCE, EMILY

120 Corporate Blvd

Norfolk, VA 23502

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE AS TO LITO VITUG FILED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: VITUG LLITO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE AS TO LITO VITUG FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATESLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130116-0217-CK 131/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201301160217 PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • Financial: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-C-001

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State Bar number, and address): FOR COURT USE ONLY EMILY PIERCE (BAR NO. 240084)JORDAN D. COOK (BAR NO. 179720)/LOR! N. WILLIAMS (BAR NO. 242985)

KRISTEN L. BRINKERHOFF NO. 263579

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

120 CORPORATE BOULEVARD

NORFOLK, VA 23502

TELEPHONE NO. 1 (866) 428-8102 FAX NO. (Optional): E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optional). ATTORNEY FOR (Name) PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

STREET ADDRESS: 400 County Center, Room A F I ! E D MAILING ADDRESS:

CITY AND ZIP CODE' Redwood Clty, CA 94063 AN MATEO CO U NTY

BRANCH NAME" Southem Branch: Hall of Justice and Records

PLAINTIFF: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

DEFENDANT: LITO VITUG

[ X ]DOES1TO 25

NEPOIY CLER.

CONTRACT

[X] COMPLAINT [C_] AMENDED COMPLAINT (Number):

[ 1 CROSS-COMPLAINT [_] AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (Numben):

Jurisdiction (check all that apply): CASE NUMBER:

[X] ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL

Amount demanded [ X ] does not exceed $10,000

[ exceeds $10,000 but does not exceed $25,000 CLJ51 90 O 2

[_J ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000)

[_] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint [] from limited to unlimited [__] from unlimited to limited

1. Plaintiff* (name or names): PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC alleges causes of action against defendant* (name or names):

LITO VITUG

2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 3. a. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult [[x7] except plaintiff (name): PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (1) [_] a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [_] an unicorporated entity (describe): (3) [x7] other (specify): A Limited Liability Company qualified to do business in California

b. [] Plaintiff (name): a. [_] has complied with the fictitious business name Iaws and is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

b. [_] has complied with all licensing requirements as a licensed (specify):. ¢. [] Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent adults is shown in Attachement 3c.

4. a. Eachdefendant named above is a natural person

[] except defendant (name): [ except defendant (name): (1) [_] a business organization, form unknown (1) [_] a business organization, form unknown (2) ] a corporation (2) [] a corporation (3) ] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (4) [_] a public entity (describe): (5) [__] other (specify): (5) [_] other (specify): * if this form is used as a cross-complalnt, ptaintifl means cross-complaintant and defendant means cross-defendant. Page 1of 2 me&d f??é":lm:;w COMPLAI NT—Contract Code of Civil Procedure, § 425.12

PLD-C-001 [Rev. January 1, 2007)

PLD-C-001

SHORTTTLE" PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. LITO VITUG CASE NUMBER

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) ] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) (] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): plaintiff. ¢. [ ] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [_] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5. [] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [_] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [_] is excused from complying because (specify): 6. [] This action is subjectto [ Civil Code section 1812.10 [ ] Civil Code section 2984.4. This court is the proper court because . [] a defendant entered into the contract here. [] adefendant lived here when the contract was entered into. . [X] adefendant lives here now. . [ the contract was to be performed here. . [] adefendantis a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. [] real property that is the subject of this action is located here. . [L] other (specify):

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements abcove apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached):

[ Breach of Contract [x] Common Counts [] Other (specify):

9. [X] Other allegations: BEFORE COMMENCEMENT OF THIS ACTION, PLAINTIFF INFORMED THE DEFENDANT(S) IN

WRITING IT INTENDED TO FILE THIS ACTION AND THAT THIS ACTION WOULD RESULT IN A

JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) THAT WOULD INCLUDE, IF APPLICABLE, COURT COSTS AND NECESSARY DISBURSEMENTS ALLOWED BY CCP SECTION 1033(B)(2).

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. [x] damages of: $ 1,784.38 b. [x] interest on the damages (1)[] according to proof (2)[X] at the rate of (specify). 10 percent per year from (date): 09/29/2011 c. [] attomey's fees (M of:$ (2)[] according to proof. d. [x] other (specify): NOTICE TO THE DEFENDANT(S): ALL NOTICES, LETTERS, PAYMENTS, AND OTHER PAPERS ARE

TO BE MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY AT THE ADDRESS LISTED IN THE CASE CAPTION

UNLESS SUCH TIME, IF ANY, THAT YOU RECEIVE FORMAL WRITTEN NOTICE OF A CHANGE OR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY BY PLAINTIFF.

11 [] The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

are persons whose capacities are unknown to

© "0 a0 Co

Date: November 21, 2012 Jordan D. Cook/Lori N. Williams/Emily Pierce/Kristen L. Brinkerhoff » e,

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) TURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

(If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verificalion.!