This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/05/2023 at 06:46:14 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc vs. Dayanne Nah

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dayanne Nah. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mau, Michael L, Greenberg, Susan, Chou, Danny Y and CHOU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0340

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mau, Michael L

Greenberg, Susan

Chou, Danny Y

CHOU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc

Defendant

Nah, Dayanne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLISS, WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration in support of reduced filing fee.

Declaration in support of reduced filing fee

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CMC Comment AND CMC

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; STATEMENT OF LOC Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; STATEMENT OF LOCATION/VENUE

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes

Stipulation for Conditional Entry of Judgment pursuant to.

Stipulation for Conditional Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 664.6 Comment CCP 664.6

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Order.

Order Type: ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENTSigned by: JUDGE CHOUDate Si Comment Type: ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT Signed by: JUDGE CHOU Date Signed: 03/10/2023

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Transaction Assessment $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Party; Names; Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Nah, Dayanne; Comment: 664.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Nah, Dayanne; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; Nah, Dayanne; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Transaction Assessment $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketStay Lifted Due To:.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Type: ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENTSigned by: JUDGE CHOUDate Si Comment Type: ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT Signed by: JUDGE CHOU Date Signed: 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-008116-HOJ Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc $221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-002589-HOJ Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc; Total Financial Assessment $221.00; Total Payments and Credits $221.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND CMC Comment AND CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in support of reduced filing fee.; Additional Info: Declaration in support of reduced filing fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less