This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:20:44 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC VS WILLIAM WHITE

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAM WHITE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4882

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC

Defendants

WILLIAM WHITE

WHITE, WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUNDQUIST, ANDREW P

 

Court Documents

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: WHITE WILLIAM; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (2) Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Affidavit. Additional Info: Comment AFF: AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE BY PLAINTIFF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0158-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270158 PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less