This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:20:58 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC VS JEROME SALANGSANG

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEROME SALANGSANG. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4885

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC

Defendants

JEROME H SALANGSANG

SALANGSANG, JEROME H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUNDQUIST, ANDREW P

BRINKEROFF, KRISTEN

PIERCE, EMILY

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (13) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $599.85, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $105.00 ---

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC SERVED ON JEROME H SALANGSANG WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/10/12.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Conversion Action.

WRIT (6) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED.

Document.

FILING (3) Comment FILED: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUPPORTING A CLERK JUDGMENT (CCP 585(A)) FILED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC AS TO JEROME H SALANGSANG.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT (CCP 585 (D) 0

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION FIRST DECLARATION (C.C.P. 585(A)) CASE SUMMARY; WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to

Conversion Action.

WRIT (30) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY SATISFIED.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 12/24/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: CHAIN OF TITLE AND BILLING STATEMENTS FILED.

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUPPORTING A CLERK JUDGMENT FILED.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION SECOND DEC. (C.C.P. 585(A)); C.C.P. 1033 (B)(2) NT NOTICE; DEF. ADMISSION TO THE ALLEGATIONS

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.30, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC; Awarded Against: SALANGSANG JEROME H; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 12/24/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JEROME H SALANGSANG PRINCIPAL IS $7,110.69. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $284.50. TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,395.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney as to. Additional Info: Substitution of Attorney as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT (30) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 151020-0836-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 151020-0825-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN MATEO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $2165.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $5959.89.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Affidavit. Additional Info: Comment AFF: AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE BY PLAINTIFF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0167-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270167 PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less