This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 10/07/2022 at 14:17:24 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC V MIREYA LAYNEZ

Case Summary

On 01/16/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIREYA LAYNEZ. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9001

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

LAYNEZ, MIREYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERCE, EMILY D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULD JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC AS TO MIREYA LAYNEZ.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUD-100 SERVED ON MIREYA LAYNEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 04/12/14.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 02/21/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 1033(B)(2) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION RE REDUCED FILING FEES FILED.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUD-100 SERVED ON MIREYA LAYNEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 04/12/14. Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUD-100 SERVED ON MIREYA LAYNEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 04/12/14.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 02/21/14 AS FOLLOWS: Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 02/21/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

DECLARATION REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULD JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED Comment DEC: DECLARATION REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULD JUDGMENT CCP 585 FILED

Declaration.

DECLARATION COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 1033(B)(2) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED Comment DEC: DECLARATION COMPLIANCE WITH CCP 1033(B)(2) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC WITHOUT PR Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC AS Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC AS TO MIREYA LAYNEZ.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC SERVED ON Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC SERVED ON MIREYA LAYNEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/29/13.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUD-100 SERVED ON MIREYA LAYNEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 04/12/14. Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUD-100 SERVED ON MIREYA LAYNEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 04/12/14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC; Awarded Against; LAYNEZ, MIREYA; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 02/21/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MIREYA LAYNEZ PRINCIPAL IS $1,400.74. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $180.50. COSTS ARE $236.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,817.24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $1817.24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $236.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $180.50.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $1400.74.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment JAGDF: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MIREYA LAYNEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment JFP: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Clerk.; Additional Info: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 02/21/14 AS FOLLOWS: Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 02/21/14 AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC; Case Payment Receipt # 201301160361 PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • FinancialFinancial; PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/16/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION RE REDUCED FILING FEES FILED. Comment DEC: DECLARATION RE REDUCED FILING FEES FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130116-0361-CK 131/ 181.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS. Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10,000.00 OR LESS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Pre/Ep

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State Bar number, and address). EMILY PIERCE (BAR NO. 240084)JORDAN D. COOK (BAR NO. 173720)/LORI N. WILLIAMS (BAR NO. 242985) KRISTEN L. BRINKERHOFF (BAR NO. 263579 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

120 CORPORATE BOULEVARD

NORFOLK, VA 23502 TELEPHONE NO: 1 (866) 428-8102 E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optional): ATTORNEY FOR (Name): PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

FAX NO. (Optional):.

STREET ADDRESS: 400 County Center, Room A MAILING ADDRESS: CITY AND ZIP CODE: Redwood City, CA 94063 BRANCH NAME: Southem Branch' Hall of Justice and Records

PLAINTIFF: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC DEFENDANT: MIREYA LAYNEZ

[(x]DoES1TO 25

CONTRACT

[x] COMPLAINT [_] AMENDED COMPLAINT (Numben):

] CROSS-COMPLAINT

[—_] AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (Number):

Jurisdiction (check all that apply):

[XJ] ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL

Amount demanded [ X | does not exceed $10,000 [ exceeds $10,000 but does not exceed $25,000 [_] ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) [_] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint [ from limited to unlimited [] from unlimited to limited

Plaintiff* (name or names): PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

alleges causes of action against defendant* (name or names):

MIREYA LAYNEZ

3. a. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult [x7] except plaintiff (name): PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (1) [[] a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [ an unicorporated entity (describe):

FOR COURT USE ONLY FILED SAN MATEO COUNTY JAN 16 2013

CASE NUMBER:

CL)J519001

This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages:

(3) [ x7] other (specify): A Limited Liability Company qualified to do business in California

b. [ ] Plaintiff (name):

a. [_] has complied with the fictitious business name laws and is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

b. [_] has complied with all licensing requirements as a licensed (specify):

. Each defendant named above is a natural person [_] except defendant (name): (1) [C_] a business organization, form unknown (2) ] a corporation (3) [_] an unincorporated entity (describe):

(4) [_] a public entity (describe): (5) [ other (specitfy):

Form Approved for Optional Use Judicial Council of California PLD-C-001 [Rev. January 1, 2007]

COMPLAINT—Contract

. [__] Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent aduits is shown in Attachement 3c.

[_] except defendant (name): (1) ] abusiness organization, form unknown (2) [] a corporation (3) ] an unincorporated entity (describe):

(4) [__] a public entity (describe):

(5) [[] other (specify):

* if this form is used as a cross-complaint, plaintiff means cross-complaintant and defendant means cross-defendant.

Page 10f2 Code of Clvil Procedure, § 425.12

PLD-C-001

SHORTTITLE: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. MIREYA LAYNEZ CASE NUMBER:

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) [C] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

c. [] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [[] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5. [] Ptaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [_] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [] is excused from complying because (specify): 6. [_] This action is subjectto [_] Civil Code section 1812.10 [__] Civil Code section 2984.4. 7. This court is the proper court because a. [_] adefendant entered into the contract here. b. [_] adefendant lived here when the contract was entered into. . [x] a defendant lives here now. . ] the contract was to be performed here. . [] adefendant is a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. ] real property that is the subject of this action is located here. . [ other (specify):

8. The following causes of action are attéched and the statements abcove apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached):

[ Breach of Contract [x] Common Counts [[_] Other (specify):

9. [X] Other allegations: BEFORE COMMENCEMENT OF THIS ACTION, PLAINTIFF INFORMED THE DEFENDANT(S) IN

WRITING IT INTENDED TO FILE THIS ACTION AND THAT THIS ACTION WOULD RESULT IN A

JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) THAT WOULD INCLUDE, IF APPLICABLE, COURT COSTS AND NECESSARY DISBURSEMENTS ALLOWED BY CCP SECTION 1033(B)(2).

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. [x] damages of: $ 1,400.74 b. [x] interest on the damages (1)] according to proof (2)[x] atthe rate of (specify): 10 percent per year from (date): 12/16/2011 c. [] attomey's fees M[] of:$ (2)[_] according to proof. d. [X] other (specify): NOTICE TO THE DEFENDANT(S): ALL NOTICES, LETTERS, PAYMENTS, AND OTHER PAPERS ARE

TO BE MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY AT THE ADDRESS LISTED IN THE CASE CAPTION

UNLESS SUCH TIME, IF ANY, THAT YOU RECEIVE FORMAL WRITTEN NOTICE OF A CHANGE OR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY BY PLAINTIFF.

- 11 [] The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers):

c d e f. g

Date: November 21, 2012

Jordan D. Cook/Lori N. WilliamlemiIg Pierce/Kristen L. Brinkerhoff >

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME)PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

. (If you wisr; to verify this pleading, affix a verification.)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Pierce