This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/18/2022 at 11:24:00 (UTC).

PHYLLIS BEGAY vs. TOBY VILLANUEVA, et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 PHYLLIS BEGAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TOBY VILLANUEVA,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L, Swope, V. Raymond and Grandsaert, John L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4515

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L

Swope, V. Raymond

Grandsaert, John L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRUDI BEGAY, deceased

BEGAY, PHYLLIS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VILLANUEVA, TOBY

CORE-MARK INTERRELATED COMPANIES, INC., a corporation

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

CORE-MARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC., a corporation

BEST WESTERN CANYON DE CHELLY INN

CANYON DE CHELLY MOTEL, INC.

BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC.

CORE-MARK MICONTINENT, INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BEST WESTERN CANYON DE CHELLY INN

CANYON DE CHELLY MOTEL, INC.

ROES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEST, MICHELLE M

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEZON, TODD

SORENSEN, WENDY A

 

Court Documents

Order Denying.

Order Denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT INC.'S M Comment WITHOUT PREJUDICE SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Fineman (Failure to show compliance with CRC 3.1312)

Order Denying.

Order Denying DEFENDANTS CORE-MARK HOLDING COMPANY INC.'S CORE-MARK INTERRELATED COMPANIES, INC.'S; Comment DEFENDANTS CORE-MARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC.'S CORE-MARK INTERRELATED COMPANIES, INC.'S; AND TOBY VILLANUEVA'S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION ON GROUND OF INCONVENIENT FORUM Denied by Judge Fineman (failure to show compliance with CRC 3.1312)

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS Comment GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice.

Notice OF HEARING SCHEDULING FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT INC.'S Comment OF HEARING SCHEDULING FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT, INC.'S

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTI Comment SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Motion to Quash.

Original Type Motion to Quash ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Quash 08/05/2020 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CANYON DE CHE Comment PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CANYON DE CHELLY MOTEL'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; DECLARATION OF NATHAN R. HURD

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Motion to Quash.

Original Type Motion to Quash ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Quash 07/30/2020 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Order Denying.

Order Denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT INC.'S M Comment WITHOUT PREJUDICE SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Fineman (Failure to show compliance with CRC 3.1312)

Order Denying.

Order Denying DEFENDANTS CORE-MARK HOLDING COMPANY INC.'S CORE-MARK INTERRELATED COMPANIES, INC.'S; Comment DEFENDANTS CORE-MARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC.'S CORE-MARK INTERRELATED COMPANIES, INC.'S; AND TOBY VILLANUEVA'S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION ON GROUND OF INCONVENIENT FORUM Denied by Judge Fineman (failure to show compliance with CRC 3.1312)

Motion to Stay.

Original Type Motion to Stay ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Stay 08/10/2020 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment DEFENDANT BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION ON GROUND OF INCONVENIENT FORUM

Motion to Quash.

Original Type Motion to Quash ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Quash 08/05/2020 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 9/18/20 Comment CMC 9/18/20

Motion to Quash.

Original Type Motion to Quash ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Quash 07/30/2020 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Motion to Dismiss.

Original Type Motion to Dismiss ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Dismiss 07/30/2020 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment Defendants Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.'s; Core-Mark Interrelated companies, Inc.'s; and Toby Vil

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; BEGAY, PHYLLIS; VILLANUEVA, TOBY; CORE-MARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC., a corporation; CORE-MARK INTERRELATED COMPANIES, INC., a corporation; DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE; CANYON DE CHELLY MOTEL, INC.; CORE-MARK MICONTINENT, INC.; BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC.; Comment: FILED ON 4/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying.; Additional Info: Order Denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT INC.'S M Comment WITHOUT PREJUDICE SPECIALLY APPEARING DOE 1 DEFENDANT CORE-MARK MIDCONTINENT, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Fineman (Failure to show compliance with CRC 3.1312)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying.; Additional Info: Order Denying DEFENDANTS CORE-MARK HOLDING COMPANY INC.'S CORE-MARK INTERRELATED COMPANIES, INC.'S; Comment DEFENDANTS CORE-MARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC.'S CORE-MARK INTERRELATED COMPANIES, INC.'S; AND TOBY VILLANUEVA'S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION ON GROUND OF INCONVENIENT FORUM Denied by Judge Fineman (failure to show compliance with CRC 3.1312)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketTentative ruling adopted and becomes order:.; Additional Info: Comment DEFENDANT BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC'S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS This motion is MOOT. The moving party took it off calendar at the hearing on July 30, 2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay.; Additional Info: Original Type Motion to Stay ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Stay 08/10/2020 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment DEFENDANT BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS ACTION ON GROUND OF INCONVENIENT FORUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND 2 DECLARATIONS; SENT TO JUDG Comment APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND 2 DECLARATIONS; SENT TO JUDGE SWOPE FOR REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for BEGAY, PHYLLIS; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2019-048242-HOJ BEGAY, PHYLLIS $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for BEGAY, PHYLLIS; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; BEGAY, PHYLLIS; Total Financial Assessment $695.00; Total Payments and Credits $695.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less