This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/25/2022 at 18:02:57 (UTC).

PHUOC NGUYEN vs. NICOLETTE MAGBUHAT, et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 PHUOC NGUYEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NICOLETTE MAGBUHAT. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2929

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NGUYEN, PHUOC

Defendants

MAGBUHAT, NICOLETTE

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DO, DAN, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; NGUYEN, PHUOC; MAGBUHAT, NICOLETTE; DOES 1 TO 10; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for NGUYEN, PHUOC; Case Payment Receipt # 2018-039156-HOJ EFFICIO LAW GROUP $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for NGUYEN, PHUOC; Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • FinancialFinancial; NGUYEN, PHUOC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001

SHORT TITLE: CASE NUMBER:

NGUYEN V. MAGBUHAT

10. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): a. Motor Vehicle b. General Negligence c. [__] Intentional Tort d. [ ] Products Liability e. [___] Premises Liability f. [__] Other (specify):

11. Plaintiff has suffered

wage loss

[ 1 loss of use of property

hospital and medical expenses general damage

[ ] property damage

[ loss of earning capacity

[ ] other damage (specify):

©mpeo oo

12. [ ] The damages claimed for wrongful death and the relationships of plaintiff to the deceased are a. [__| listed in Attachment 12. b. [_] as follows:

13. The relief sought in this complaint is within the jurisdiction of this court.

14. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a. (1) compensatory damages (2) (] punitive damages The amount of damages is (in cases for personal injury or wrongful death, you must check (1)):

(1) according to proof (2) [_] in the amount of: $

18. The paragraphs of this complaint alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers): MV-1; GN-1

Date: JUNE 7, 2018

DAN DO ) / (TYPE OR PRINT NAME) {SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF CR ATTORNEY)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DO, DAN, ESQ