Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/23/2018 at 12:13:36 (UTC).

PHILIP PAUL VS INTERMUNE INC ETAL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2014 PHILIP PAUL filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against INTERMUNE INC ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0304

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PHILIP PAUL

PAUL, PHILIP

Defendants

INTERMUNE INC

DANIEL WELCH

LARS EKMAN

JEAN-JACQUES BIENAIME

LOUIS DRAPEAU

JAMES HEALY

DAVID KABAKOFF

ANGUS RUSSELL

FRANK VERWIEL

ROCHE HOLDINGS INC

KLEE ACQUISITION CORPORATION

WELCH, DANIEL

KABAKOFF, DAVID

EKMAN, LARS

BIENAIME, JEAN-JACQUES

DRAPEAU, LOUIS

RUSSELL, ANGUS

HEALY, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOWER, DAVID E

Defendant Attorney

PETERS, KAI

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF CM ORDER #2 REQUIRING STATUS STATEMENT SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 08/28/15 FILED.

Conversion Hearing.

HEARING NOTICE Comment COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

Declaration.

DECLARATION (11) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF KAI PETERS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE FILED BY INTERMUNE INC DANIEL WELCH, LARS EKMAN

Document.

FILING (5) Comment FILED: DECL OF KAI PETERS IN SUPPORT OF DEF'S OPPOSITION TO PLF'S EX PARTE APP FOR TEMP. RESTRAINING ORD FILED.

Document.

FILING (3) Comment FILED: ORDER ASSIGNING CASE FILED.

Conversion Action.

JOINDER (2) Comment JO: JOINDER OF ROCHE HOLDINGS INC KLEE ACQUISITION CORPORATION RE: IN THE INTERMUNE DEFS' MOTION TO DISMISS FILED

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: VERIFIED APPLICATION OF SCOTT B. LUFTGLASS TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FILED.

Conversion Action.

APPLICATION (2) Comment APHV: APPLICATION BY GARY A. BORNSTEIN TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR INTERMUNE INC DANIEL WELCH, LARS EKMAN

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS (2) Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Document.

FILING (8) Comment FILED: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLTF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING FILED.

Document.

FILING (9) Comment FILED: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE CANCELLATION OF PLTF'S EX PARTE HEARING FOR TEMPORARY FILED.

Document.

FILING (4) Comment FILED: MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD FILED.

Notice of Appearance pursuant to CCP 1014 filed.

ANSWER Comment NOA1: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PURSUANT TO CCP 1014 FILED AS TO REPRESENTED BY KAI PETERS.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 09/18/14 FILED.

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (8) Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF SANDRA WEST NEUKOM IN SUPPORT OF ROCHE HOLDINGS INC AND KLEE ACQUISITION FILED BY ROCHE HOLDINGS INC, KLEE ACQUISITION CORPORATION

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: RUSSELL ANGUS; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: KABAKOFF, DAVID; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: HEALY, JAMES; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: DRAPEAU, LOUIS; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: BIENAIME, JEAN-JACQUES; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: EKMAN, LARS; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: WELCH, DANIEL; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: INTERMUNE INC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: KLEE ACQUISITION CORPORATION; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: ROCHE HOLDINGS INC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: VERWIEL, FRANK; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PAUL, PHILIP; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (2) Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF CM ORDER #2 REQUIRING STATUS STATEMENT SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 08/28/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (14) Comment FILED: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 REQUIRING STATUS STATEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: CASE DEEMED COMPLEX AND ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: CMC NOTICE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: CASE DEEMED COMPLEX ON 9-18-14 AND ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: HEARING NOTICE Comment COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Complex Case Status Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: PJLM COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 141027-0230-CK 037/ 20.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2014
  • Financial: VERWIEL, FRANK; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Financial info for PAUL, PHILIP : Case Payment Receipt # 201410270230 PAUL, PHILIP $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Financial info for PAUL, PHILIP : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Financial info for PAUL, PHILIP : Case Payment Receipt # 201409180335 PAUL, PHILIP $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • Financial info for PAUL, PHILIP : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Financial info for PAUL, PHILIP : Case Payment Receipt # 201409080376 PAUL, PHILIP $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Financial info for PAUL, PHILIP : Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Financial info for PAUL, PHILIP : Case Payment Receipt # 201409080369 PAUL, PHILIP $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Financial info for PAUL, PHILIP : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Financial: PAUL, PHILIP; Total Financial Assessment $1,515.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,515.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROCHE HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where InterMune, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOWER DAVID E.