This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 12:18:22 (UTC).

Peaches Nong Jensen vs. Charon Solutions, Inc., a California corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 Peaches Nong Jensen filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Charon Solutions, Inc , a California corporation,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mau, Michael L. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4175

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jensen, Peaches Nong

Defendants

Charon Solutions, Inc., a California corporation

Perry Leonard Segal, an individual now doing business as Charon Law

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IEZZA, NICK I

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED- GENERAL CIVIL SENT TO.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED- GENERAL CIVIL SENT TO ORDER FOR EXAMINATION Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Comment ORDER FOR EXAMINATION

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Abstract of Judgment issued ISSUED BY LA COUNTY ON 10/06/2022 953091.32 Comment ISSUED BY LA COUNTY ON 10/06/2022 953,091.32

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re REGARDING APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION Comment REGARDING APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination AMENDEDJudgment Debtor: PERRY LEONARD SEGAL Comment AMENDED Judgment Debtor: PERRY LEONARD SEGAL

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing AMENDED APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE Comment AMENDED APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE

Request for Refund.

Request for Refund Comment FEE NOT REQUIRED FOR AMENDED APPLICATION 2022-045776-HOJ

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOrder of Examination.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Refund.; Additional Info: Request for Refund Comment FEE NOT REQUIRED FOR AMENDED APPLICATION 2022-045776-HOJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing AMENDED APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE Comment AMENDED APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jensen, Peaches Nong; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-045776-HOJ Jensen, Peaches Nong $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jensen, Peaches Nong; Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination.; Additional Info: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination AMENDEDJudgment Debtor: PERRY LEONARD SEGAL Comment AMENDED Judgment Debtor: PERRY LEONARD SEGAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOrder of Examination.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jensen, Peaches Nong; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-043391-HOJ Jensen, Peaches Nong $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jensen, Peaches Nong; Transaction Assessment $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re REGARDING APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION Comment REGARDING APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jensen, Peaches Nong; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-036798-HOJ Jensen, Peaches Nong $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jensen, Peaches Nong; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Jensen, Peaches Nong; Total Financial Assessment $555.00; Total Payments and Credits $555.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Other Clerk Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Jensen, Peaches Nong; Awarded Against; Charon Solutions, Inc., a California corporation; Perry Leonard Segal, an individual now doing business as Charon Law; Amount; Party; Names; Jensen, Peaches Nong; Charon Solutions, Inc., a California corporation; Perry Leonard Segal, an individual now doing business as Charon Law

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.; Additional Info: Abstract of Judgment issued ISSUED BY LA COUNTY ON 10/06/2022 953091.32 Comment ISSUED BY LA COUNTY ON 10/06/2022 953,091.32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination.; Additional Info: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Judgment Debtor: PERRY LEAONARD SEGAL AN INDIVI Comment Judgment Debtor: PERRY LEAONARD SEGAL AN INDIVIDUAL NOW DBA AS CHARON LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue.; Additional Info: Declaration of Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less