This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:59:14 (UTC).

PAULA PARKET VS KWOK HONG CHUNG ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 PAULA PARKET filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KWOK HONG CHUNG ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Dylina, Steven L, Scott, Joseph C, Novak, Lisa A, Grandsaert, John L., Dylina, Steven L., Novak, Lisa A. and Scott, Joseph C.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5889

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Dylina, Steven L

Scott, Joseph C

Novak, Lisa A

Grandsaert, John L.

Dylina, Steven L.

Novak, Lisa A.

Scott, Joseph C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAULA PARKER

PARKER, PAULA

Defendants

KWOK HONG CHUNG

CHUNG, KWOK HONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CATTERMOLE, GREGORY C.

Schaiman, Steven L.

CATTERMOLE, GREGORY C

Defendant Attorney

BURROW, LANCE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE (8) Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY PAULA PARKER

Conversion Action.

NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Notice.

NOTICE (6) Comment N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM MAILING ADDRESS ONLY FILED BY KWOK HONG CHUNG.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (5) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KWOK HONG CHUNG.

Order.

ORDER (4) Comment O: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE SIGNED BY JUDGE FOILES ON 02/20/14, FILED.

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF PARKER FILED BY KWOK HONG CHUNG REPRESENTED BY LANCE BURROW

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Judicial Officer Novak Lisa A Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Substitution of Attorney as to.

ATTORNEY Comment SAT: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. FORMER ATTORNEY GREGORY C. CATTERMOLE REMOVED AS TO PAULA PARKER AND REPLACED WITH ATTORNEY GREGORY C CATTERMOLE.

Notice.

NOTICE (7) Comment N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM MAILING ADDRESS ONLY FILED BY KWOK HONG CHUNG.

Amended.

AMENDED FILING Comment AMEN: AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE; FILED BY KWOK HONG CHUNG.

Document.

COURT DOCUMENT (18) Comment IMGDOC: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC RE: DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ON 03/15/16 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 21.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE (2) Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PARKER AS TO KWOK HONG CHUNG BY SUB-SERVING MICHAEL DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/02/13.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DEFT KWOK HONG CHUNG DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED.

Conversion Action.

STIPULATION Comment SO2: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE SIGNED BY ROBERT D. FOILES ON 07/30/14.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Grandsaert John L.; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Court Ordered; Party; Names: PARKER, PAULA; CHUNG, KWOK HONG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dispositioned; Party; Name: CHUNG KWOK HONG; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PARKER, PAULA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Case dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • ReOpened.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: Schaiman, Steven L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment LINE: =====================================

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY A ORTEGA ON 03/30/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
193 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2013
  • Financial info for CHUNG, KWOK HONG : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • Financial info for CHUNG, KWOK HONG : Case Payment Receipt # 201308140541 CHUNG, KWOK HONG $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • Financial info for CHUNG, KWOK HONG : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • Financial: CHUNG, KWOK HONG; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Financial info for PARKER, PAULA : Case Payment Receipt # 201407290700 PARKER, PAULA $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Financial info for PARKER, PAULA : Case Payment Receipt # 201402200726 PARKER, PAULA $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • Financial info for PARKER, PAULA : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for PARKER, PAULA : Case Payment Receipt # 201208070070 PARKER, PAULA $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for PARKER, PAULA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial: PARKER, PAULA; Total Financial Assessment $555.00; Total Payments and Credits $555.00

    Read MoreRead Less