This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/04/2022 at 06:10:59 (UTC).

Paul Zlatunich vs. DOES 1 - 100, inclusive, et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Paul Zlatunich filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against DOES 1 - 100, inclusive. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and FOILES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2834

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

Not Yet Classified

FOILES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zlatunich, Paul

Defendants

Doe, Jane

DOES 1 - 100

DOES 1 - 100, inclusive

COLBY, JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIT, BRIAN M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of COMPLAINT CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, AMENDED SUMM Comment COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, AMENDED SUMMONS, AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION, ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AS THE ACTION IS NOT YET "AT ISSUE", AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING, SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL, EXHIBITS

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE JANE DOE an individual as JENNIFER COLBY, an individual Comment NAMING DOE/ROE JANE DOE, an individual as JENNIFER COLBY, an individual

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: BRIAN M HEITNew Attorney: PAUL ZLATUNICH PRO PER Comment Former Attorney: BRIAN M HEIT New Attorney: PAUL ZLATUNICH, PRO PER

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

First Amended Complaint.

First Amended Complaint

Amended Summons Issued / Filed.

Amended Summons Issued / Filed FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Complaint.

Complaint

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

2022 04 11 Notice of Settlement Executed.pdf

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Change of Address.

Change of Address

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: PRO SENew Attorney: BRIAN M. HEIT Comment Former Attorney: PRO SE New Attorney: BRIAN M. HEIT

Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of COMPLAINT CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, AMENDED SUMM Comment COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, AMENDED SUMMONS, AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION, ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AS THE ACTION IS NOT YET "AT ISSUE", AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING, SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL, EXHIBITS

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

First Amended Complaint.

First Amended Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: 2022 04 11 Notice of Settlement Executed.pdf Comment Type: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT REQUEST FOR RETENTION OF JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT ORDER THEREON Signed by: JUDGE FOILES Date Signed: 04/22/2022 COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY BRIAN M. HEIT ON 04/25/2022 BY CLERK SALOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; Zlatunich, Paul; DOES 1 - 100, inclusive; COLBY, JENNIFER; Comment: FILED ON 4/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLBY, JENNIFER; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-014375-HOJ COLBY, JENNIFER $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLBY, JENNIFER; Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: 2022 04 11 Notice of Settlement Executed.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLBY, JENNIFER; Case Payment Receipt # 2022-008089-HOJ NORTHERN CALIFORNIA LEGAL SUPPORT SERVICES, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for COLBY, JENNIFER; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; COLBY, JENNIFER; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney as to.; Additional Info: Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: BRIAN M HEITNew Attorney: PAUL ZLATUNICH PRO PER Comment Former Attorney: BRIAN M HEIT New Attorney: PAUL ZLATUNICH, PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zlatunich, Paul; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-019919-HOJ Zlatunich, Paul $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zlatunich, Paul; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Zlatunich, Paul; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIT BRIAN M.