This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:43:32 (UTC).

PAUL ROBERT LAWLER vs. CITY OF MILLBRAE, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 PAUL ROBERT LAWLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF MILLBRAE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L. and Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2791

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWLER, PAUL ROBERT

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF MILLBRAE

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

BURGER KING

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

CALTRANS DEPARTMENT OF STREET AND SIDEWALK MAINTAINENCE

FONG, CHUNG KO

B.W.D., INC

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

QIU MIN TRUST

MIN, QIU

ZOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

QIU, MIN

ROES 1-20, inclusive

ROES 1 TO 10

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RABINEAU, LARRY

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEWIS, DANIELLE K

BUDRA, MICHAEL K

HARRINGTON, G MICHAEL

JOYCE, SHAUN WILLIAM

BURROW, LANCE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer.

Answer TO CROSS COMPLAINT Comment TO CROSS COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; CROSS-COMPLAINT; SUMMONS ON FIRS Comment SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; CROSS-COMPLAINT; SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE DOE 75 as CHUNG KO FONG Comment NAMING DOE/ROE DOE 75 as CHUNG KO FONG

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/07/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ADR PACKAGE; AME Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ADR PACKAGE; AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT; FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT; FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer.

Answer TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF QIU MIN TRUST Comment TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF QIU MIN TRUST

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 2/7/19 Comment CMC 2/7/19

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE Comment FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer to PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment Answer to PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA ONLY Si Comment Type: OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA ONLY Signed by: JUDGE SWOPE Date Signed: 5-13-19

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA ONLY.); Party; Name: STATE OF CALIFORNIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Master Calendar - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment 5 DAY TIME ESTIMATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Return Letter Re: Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Return Letter Re: Stipulation and Order to ADR MISSING NETURAL NAME AND NUMBER AND DATE OF SESSION Comment MISSING NETURAL NAME AND NUMBER AND DATE OF SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Order. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA Comment OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order. Additional Info: Stipulation & Order Type: OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA ONLY Si Comment Type: OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA ONLY Signed by: JUDGE SWOPE Date Signed: 5-13-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept #23 OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO Comment #23 OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing re. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re JURY TRIAL AND MSC Comment JURY TRIAL AND MSC

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • Financial info for CITY OF MILLBRAE : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-030751-HOJ CITY OF MILLBRAE $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Financial info for CITY OF MILLBRAE : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Financial info for CITY OF MILLBRAE : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-008067-HOJ SELMAN & BREITMAN $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Financial info for CITY OF MILLBRAE : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Financial info for CITY OF MILLBRAE : Government Exemption $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Financial info for CITY OF MILLBRAE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Financial: CITY OF MILLBRAE; Total Financial Assessment $605.00; Total Payments and Credits $605.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for LAWLER, PAUL ROBERT : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037352-HOJ RABINEAU, LARRY $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for LAWLER, PAUL ROBERT : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: LAWLER, PAUL ROBERT; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less