This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 00:06:24 (UTC).

Patricia Mauldin vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANIES, et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Patricia Mauldin filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANIES,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia Schnegg, Ret.; Hon David R. Chaffee, Ret and Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5832

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Patricia Schnegg, Ret.; Hon David R. Chaffee, Ret

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mauldin, Patricia

Respondents

State Farm Insurance Company

DOES 1 TO 10

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GALLIGAN, PATRICK T.

Respondent Attorney

CURTIS, KATHERINE L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Petition.

Petition PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF AN UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM Comment PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF AN UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Motion for Order.

Original Type Motion for Order ~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Order 06/27/2022 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF BY PLAINTIFF PATRICIA MAULDIN

Notice.

Notice Comment RE-NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR A COURT ORDER APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

Motion for Order.

Original Type Motion for Order ~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Order 06/06/2022 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment FOR A COURT ORDER APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply TO STATE FARM'S OPPOSITION TO THE APPOINTMENT OF AN AR Comment TO STATE FARM'S OPPOSITION TO THE APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply TO MOTION TO APPOINT ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS Comment TO MOTION TO APPOINT ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MARIA A. GROVER

Motion.

Motion FOR A COURT ORDER APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF;ETC.. Comment FOR A COURT ORDER APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF;ETC...

Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.

Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference for August 5 202 Comment for August 5, 202

Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.

Original Type Case Management and Trial Setting Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 01/21/2022 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMotion for Order.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM Comment FOR A COURT ORDER APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketTentative ruling adopted and becomes order:.; Additional Info: Comment MOTION FOR COURT ORDER APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF BY PLAINTIFF PATRICIA MAULDIN The motion to appoint an arbitrator is GRANTED pursuant to CCP 1281.6. The Court nominates the following to act as arbitrator in this matter: Charles Dyer; Gregory Cattermole; Dario de Ghetaldi; Hon. Patricia Schnegg Ret.; Hon David R. Chaffee, Ret. The parties may select an arbitrator within five days of receipt of notice of the nominees whether or not the individual is on the above list. If, however, the parties fail to select an arbitrator within the five-day period, the court shall appoint the arbitrator from the above nominees. If the tentative ruling is uncontested, it shall become the order of the Court. Thereafter, counsel for Petitioner shall prepare a written order consistent with the Court's ruling for the Court's signature, pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1312, and provide written notice of the ruling to all parties who have appeared in the action, as required by law and the California Rules of Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNo appearance by any parties or their counsel of record..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order.; Additional Info: Original Type Motion for Order ~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Order 06/27/2022 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF BY PLAINTIFF PATRICIA MAULDIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice RE-NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR A COURT ORDER APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MO Comment RE-NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR A COURT ORDER APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketTentative ruling modified and becomes order:.; Additional Info: Comment MOTION FOR COURT ORDER APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF BY PLAINTIFF PATRICIA MAULDIN Matter continued to June 27 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order.; Additional Info: Original Type Motion for Order ~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Order 06/06/2022 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment FOR A COURT ORDER APPOINTING AN ARBITRATOR IN THE UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mauldin, Patricia; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-045095-HOJ Mauldin, Patricia $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Mauldin, Patricia; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Mauldin, Patricia; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition.; Additional Info: Petition PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF AN UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM Comment PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF AN UNINSURED MOTORIST CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALLIGAN, PATRICK T.