This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/24/2018 at 04:07:10 (UTC).

PACIFICA MARINERS POINTE VS WARMINGTON MARINERS ET

Case Summary

On 06/08/2004 PACIFICA MARINERS POINTE filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WARMINGTON MARINERS ET. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S, KOPP, QUENTIN L, Foiles, Robert D, Bergeron, Joseph E, Buchwald, Gerald J, Miram, George A, Forcum, Mark R, Buchwald, Gerald J., Weiner, Marie S., Forcum, Mark R. and Miram, George A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9832

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

KOPP, QUENTIN L

Foiles, Robert D

Bergeron, Joseph E

Buchwald, Gerald J

Miram, George A

Forcum, Mark R

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Weiner, Marie S.

Forcum, Mark R.

Miram, George A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFICA MARINERS POINTE OWNERS' ASSOCIATION

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WARMINGTON HOMES

WARMINGTON MARINERS POINTE ASSOCIATES, LP

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

RAIN GUTTER INSTALLATIONS

WARMINGTON HOMES

WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY

T & D TILE CO., INC

CUMMINGS MASONRY

ETTER & SON CONSTRUCTION

WARMINGTON MARINERS POINTE ASSOCIATES, LP

THE GARAGE DOOR CENTER

NOISE SOLUTIONS, INC.

SIMPLEX GRINNELL, LP

WORTHEN ENTERPRISES, INC

RIVERVIEW LANDSCAPING, INC

STAIRBUILDERS

JC DRYWALL

AMBERWOOD

BLUE RIBBON STAIRS, INC.

WESTERN SHOWER DOORS

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA NAIL COMPANY, INC.

COAST INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC.

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANEDA, JOSEPH

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WOOG, PHIL

SCHELEY, L. THEODORE, III

MILLER, DANIEL R.

MARTIN, SUZANNE M

WHYTE, NICOLE

GILBERT, HARRY C, ESQ

REYES, VON RYAN

OSBORNE, MICHAEL C

LEVY, DAVID M.

LINDBERG, D. DEAN

BURKE, SARAH F.

LAWLEY, ELIZABETH W.

BABBITS, DENNIS A

Other Attorneys

CRESPO, DANIEL A

POLLIONI, MARCIA A.

WELCH, STEPHEN B.

WITZMAN, JOEL

ACQUESTA, MARY

STAPLES, WILLIAM H.

5 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2006
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution; Party; Name: MOES 1 - 100 INCLUSIVE; Comment: 0009 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0009 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution; Party; Name: CERTIFIED PRODUCTS; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: BLUE RIBBON STAIRS INC.; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: ATLANTIC CONCRETE; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: AMBERWOOD; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: GARAGE DOOR CENTER; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: STAIRBUILDERS; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: VACA VALLEY ROOFING, INC; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: HENDER CEMENT; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: HARZA ENGINEERING; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: W.L. HICKEY; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: COAST INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2005
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: SACRAMENTO A-1; Comment: 0008 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution; Party; Name: Comment: 0007 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0007 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0007 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution; Party; Name: Comment: 0006 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0006 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0006 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution; Party; Name: Comment: 0005 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0005 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0005 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution; Party; Name: Comment: 0004 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0004 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0004 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2006
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: CHATEAU INTERIOR; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CERTIFIED PRODUCTS; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: BLUE RIBBON STAIRS INC.; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: ATLANTIC CONCRETE; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: AMBERWOOD; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: WESTERN PRODUCTS; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: STAIRBUILDERS; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: VACA VALLEY ROOFING, INC; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: JC DRYWALL; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: HENDER CEMENT; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: HARZA ENGINEERING; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: EZ ELECTRIC; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: EXPRESS DRYWALL; Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0003 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
1,188 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2006
  • Financial info for SACRAMENTO A-1 : Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • Financial: SACRAMENTO A-1; Total Financial Assessment $40.00; Total Payments and Credits $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2006
  • Financial info for VACA VALLEY ROOFING, INC : Case Payment Receipt # 200602170218 VACA VALLEY ROOFING, INC $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2006
  • Financial info for VACA VALLEY ROOFING, INC : Case Payment Receipt # 200602170215 VACA VALLEY ROOFING, INC $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2006
  • Financial info for VACA VALLEY ROOFING, INC : Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2006
  • Financial: VACA VALLEY ROOFING, INC; Total Financial Assessment $80.00; Total Payments and Credits $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • Financial info for JC DRYWALL : Case Payment Receipt # 200602230137 JC DRYWALL $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • Financial info for JC DRYWALL : Case Payment Receipt # 200602230136 JC DRYWALL $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • Financial info for JC DRYWALL : Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • Financial: JC DRYWALL; Total Financial Assessment $80.00; Total Payments and Credits $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARAGE DOOR CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Warmington Homes is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMPLEX GRINNEL LP is a litigant

Latest cases where WORTHEN ENTERPRISES, INC is a litigant