This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:59:37 (UTC).

OSCAR ORTEGA VS PACIFICA SCHOOL DIST

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 OSCAR ORTEGA filed an Other lawsuit against PACIFICA SCHOOL DIST. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V Raymond and Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5885

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V Raymond

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OSCAR ORTEGA

ORTEGA, OSCAR

Defendants

PACIFICA SCHOOL DISCTRICT

WENDY TUKLOFF

TUKLOFF, WENDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SHUPE, JOHN A

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PACIFICA SCHOOL DISCTRICT WENDY TUKLOFF IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL AND DEMURRERS TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Hearing re.

NOTICE Comment NH: NOTICE OF HEARING RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY PACIFICA SCHOOL DIST. FILED.

Conversion Action.

DEMURRER Comment DEM: (S) DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF ORTEGA FILED BY PACIFICA SCHOOL DISCTRICT WENDY TUKLOFF REPRESENTED BY JOHN A SHUPE

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PACIFICA SCHOOL DISCTRICT WENDY TUKLOFF.

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF DISMISSAL PAGES SERVED ON JOHN A. SITUPE WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 01/11/13 FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF JOHN SHUPE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS

Fee Waiver Granted.

ORDER - FEE WAIVER Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY OSCAR ORTEGA GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00 SIGNED BY R KRILL ON 08/13/12.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: TUKLOFF WENDY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PACIFICA SCHOOL DISCTRICT; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: ORTEGA, OSCAR; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 13 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY S.HARRIS ON 01/15/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: * *.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: MATTER IS MOOT. DISMISSAL FILED ON JANUARY 10 2013 AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment NAP: NO APPEARANCE IS MADE BY ANY PARTIES HEREIN OR THEIR COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Comment JCRB: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: SANDRA HARRIS, COURT REPORTER: GERALDINE VANDEVELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Comment HEARING: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF ORTEGA BY PACIFICA SCHOOL DISCTRICT, WENDY TUKLOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • Hearing on Demurrer. Additional Info: Original Type Hearing on Demurrer Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment Dept: LM HEARING: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF ORTEGA BY PACIFICA SCHOOL DISCTRICT, WENDY TUKLOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: DEMURRER Comment DEM: (S) DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF ORTEGA FILED BY PACIFICA SCHOOL DISCTRICT WENDY TUKLOFF REPRESENTED BY JOHN A SHUPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing re. Additional Info: NOTICE Comment NH: NOTICE OF HEARING RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY PACIFICA SCHOOL DIST. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment *XFR: --> CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM CIV/515883 TO CIV/515885.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Fee Waiver Granted. Additional Info: ORDER - FEE WAIVER Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY OSCAR ORTEGA GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00 SIGNED BY R KRILL ON 08/13/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Request to Waive Court Fees. Additional Info: Comment APWF: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY OSCAR ORTEGA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less